EP2191841 - Antitumor combinations containing antibodies recognizing specifically CD38 and vincristine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis 174 Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Bouvet, Philippe, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | Bouvet, Philippe, et al Patent Department ADF2 174 Avenue de France 75635 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08291117.3 | 28.11.2008 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2191841 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K31/00, A61P35/00 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/475, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antitumorkombinationen mit Antikörpern, die insbesondere CD38 und Vincristin erkennen | [2010/22] | English: | Antitumor combinations containing antibodies recognizing specifically CD38 and vincristine | [2010/22] | French: | Combinaisons antitumorales contenant des anticorps reconnaissant spécifiquement les CD38 et vincristine | [2010/22] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/44] | 26.06.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9962526 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,2 * * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 2 *; | [X]WO2006099875 (GENMAB AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 176, line 15 - line 29 * * page 168, line 10 - page 172, line 8 *; | [X]EP1914242 (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 47 - line 51 * * page 26, line 19 * * page 26, line 25 - line 33 *; | [A] - ELLIS JONATHAN H ET AL, "Engineered anti-CD38 monoclonal antibodies for immunotherapy of multiple myeloma", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (19950101), vol. 155, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 925 - 937, XP002146232 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - PEIPP M ET AL, "FULLY HUMAN CD38 ANTIBODIES EFFICIENTLY TRIGGER ADCC AND CDC OF MULTIPLE MYELOMA AND PLASMA CELL LEUKEMIA CELLS", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://www.genmab.com/upload/poster_ash_2005_monday_05-12-2005.pdf, (20080318), XP002473215 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - PEIPP M ET AL, "FULLY HUMAN CD38 ANTIBODIES EFFICIENTLY TRIGGER ADCC OF MULTIPLE MYELOMA CELL LINES AND PRIMARY TUMOR CELLS", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20051101), vol. 106, no. 11, PART 01, ISSN 0006-4971, page 944A,ABSTRACTNO.3377, XP009069301 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [ ] - PEIPP M ET AL, "Fully human CD38 antibodies efficiently trigger ADCC of multiple myeloma cell lines and primary tumor cells", BIOSIS,, (19000101), XP002389878 | by applicant | US4444887 | EP0239400 | US4716111 | WO9109967 | WO9110741 | WO9222653 | EP0519596 | EP0592106 | US5530101 | US5545806 | US5565332 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5585089 | US5639641 | WO9816654 | WO9824893 | US5814318 | WO9846645 | WO9850433 | WO2008047242 | - PADLAN E. A., MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 28, no. 4-5, pages 489 - 498 | - STUDNICKA G. M. ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1994), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 805 - 814 | - ROGUSKA M.A. ET AL., PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973 | - T.H. CORBETT ET AL., CANCER, (1977), vol. 40, pages 2660 - 2680 | - "Cancer Drug Development", F.M. SCHABEL ET AL., Methods in Cancer Research, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., (1979), vol. 17, pages 3 - 51 | WO2008US74381 |