EP2204783 - Security system comprising sensors in a corridor for uncovering hazardous items [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 45, rue de Villiers 92526 Neuilly-sur-Seine Cédex / FR | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zolesio, Jean-Luc 32, rue Turquoise 78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
Lamarque, Thierry 57, rue Gabriel Péri 78114 Magny-Les-Hameaux / FR | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Nguyen-Van-Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Nguyen Van Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08291258.5 | 31.12.2008 | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2204783 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/181, G08B15/00, G08B31/00, G08B13/196 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
G08B13/181 (EP);
G08B13/19615 (EP);
G08B15/00 (EP);
G08B31/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | Sicherheitssystem mit Sensoren in einem Korridor zur Aufdeckung von gefährlichen Elementen | [2010/27] | English: | Security system comprising sensors in a corridor for uncovering hazardous items | [2010/27] | French: | Système de sécurité comportant des capteurs dans un corridor pour découvrir les articles dangereux | [2010/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 06.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005066912 (ELBIT SYSTEMS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 9, line 13 - line 21 * * page 10, line 6 - line 23 * * page 11, line 10 - line 15 * * page 17, line 26 - page 18, line 2 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2004190757 (MURPHY KEVIN SJ [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,11-15,17,18 * paragraphs [0013] - [0016] - [0019] , [0026] , [0032] , [0039] , [0058] , [0059] , [0063] - [0066] - [0070] - [0072]; figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO2007061331 (CLOSED JOINT STOCK COMPANY AFR [RU], et al) [X] 1-6,11-15,17,18 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 3 * * figures 1,2,7,8,15 *; | [X]WO9921148 (IDS INTELLIGENT DETECTION SYST [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,11-15,17,18 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2005066912 | US2004190757 | WO2007061331 | WO9921148 |