EP2014884 - Assessment of the charge of a particle filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault SAS 13-15, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lombaert, Karine 3 rue du Commandant Louis Bouchet 78114 Magny les Hameaux / FR | 02 /
Guy-Bouyssou, Delphine 3 Allée Des Vergers 91670 Angerville / FR | [2009/03] | Application number, filing date | 08300232.9 | 07.07.2008 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | FR20070004946 | 09.07.2007 Original published format: FR 0704946 | [2009/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014884 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/023, F01N9/00 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
F01N9/002 (EP);
F01N3/023 (EP);
F01N3/0231 (EP);
F01N3/0842 (EP);
F01N2560/02 (EP);
F01N2560/026 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Evaluierung der Ladung eines Partikelfilters | [2009/03] | English: | Assessment of the charge of a particle filter | [2009/03] | French: | Evaluation du chargement d'un filtre a particules | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 13.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102005000978 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0180977 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 12, paragraph 4 - page 13, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS5862309 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]DE10148915 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 4, line 10 - line 21; figure . *; | [A]EP1739291 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2781251 | EP1281843 | FR2877393 |