EP1972738 - Form panel comprising a device for plugging tie holes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hussor (Société par Actions Simplifiée) La Croix d'Orbey 68650 Lapoutroie / FR | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHR, Arthur 39A Grand'Rue 68280, ANDOLSHEIM / FR | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08305059.1 | 17.03.2008 | [2008/39] | Priority number, date | FR20070053917 | 20.03.2007 Original published format: FR 0753917 | [2008/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1972738 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/39] | Classification | IPC: | E04G17/00, E04G17/06 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
E04G17/00 (EP);
E04G17/007 (EP);
E04G17/06 (EP);
E04G2011/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verschalung, die eine Vorrichtung zum Verschliessen der Löcher der Abstandshalter umfasst | [2008/39] | English: | Form panel comprising a device for plugging tie holes | [2008/39] | French: | Banche comprenant un dispositif de bouchage des passages de broches | [2008/39] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | FR2574840 | DE8710675U |