EP2131169 - Strain sensor with high gauge factor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecole Polytechnique 91128 Palaiseau Cedex / FR | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE GENEVE 24, rue du Général-Dufour 1211 Genève 4 / CH | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states Ecole Polytechnique 91128 Palaiseau Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE GENEVE 24, rue du Général-Dufour 1211 Genève 4 / CH | |||
For all designated states Centre National de La Recherche Scientifique-CNRS 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rowe, Alistair Residence de la Colline rue François Leroux 91400, ORSAY / FR | 02 /
Renner, Christoph 18, Upper Wimpole Street LONDRES, W1G 6LX / GB | 03 /
Arscott, Steve 17 rue Nicot 59130, LAMBERSART / FR | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08305233.2 | 05.06.2008 | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2131169 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/22 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
G01L1/2293 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Belastungsmesser mit hohem K-Faktor | [2009/50] | English: | Strain sensor with high gauge factor | [2009/50] | French: | Capteur de contrainte à facteur de jauge élevé | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9942799 (HONEYWELL DATA INSTR INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 4a,4b * * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 4 * * page 7, lines 11-29 * * claims 26,29,36 * * page 10, lines 5-11 *; | [A]US3585415 (MULLER RICHARD S, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 26-30 * * column 5, lines 30-41 * * claims 4,10 *; | [A]US2005036905 (GOKTURK HALIT SUHA [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0083] , [0084] * * paragraphs [0110] - [0112] *; | [A]US4937550 (TAWADA YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 24-32 * | [A] - STRITTMATTER R P ET AL, "Piezoelectrically enhanced capacitive strain sensors using GaN metal-insulator-semiconductor diodes", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20031101), vol. 94, no. 9, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 5958 - 5963, XP012060586 [A] 1-15 * page 5961, paragraph B - page 5962 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1611267 | by applicant | WO2007080259 |