EP2154919 - Mobility management method in a heterogeneous system and related devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duda, Adrian Upper Flat 36 Cleveland Park Crescent London E17 7BT / GB | 02 /
Dong, Song 7a The Precinct High Street Egham TW20 9HN / GB | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08305291.0 | 20.06.2008 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154919 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/14 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
H04W36/0085 (EP,US);
H04W36/302 (EP,US);
H04W36/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/42] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobilitätsverwaltungsverfahren in einem heterogenen System und dazugehörige Vorrichtungen | [2010/07] | English: | Mobility management method in a heterogeneous system and related devices | [2010/07] | French: | Procédé de gestion de la mobilité dans un système hétérogène et dispositif associés | [2010/07] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9825431 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [YA]US2002187784 (TIGERSTEDT KARL [FI], et al); | [Y]US2003134638 (SUNDAR RANGAMANI [US], et al); | [XY]US2004165563 (HSU RAYMOND T [US], et al); |