EP2154604 - Countermeasure securing exponentiation based cryptography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vigilant, David IP dept Axalto SA 6 rue de la Verrerie 92190, Meudon / FR | [2010/07] | Application number, filing date | 08305453.6 | 06.08.2008 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154604 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/72 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
G06F7/723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/42] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gegenmassname zum Schutz von auf Potenzierung basierender Kryptographie | [2010/07] | English: | Countermeasure securing exponentiation based cryptography | [2010/07] | French: | Contre-mesure pour sécuriser la cryptographie à base d'exponentiation | [2010/07] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - AUMUELLER C ET AL, "FAULT ATTACKS ON RSA WITH CRT: CONCRETE RESULTS AND PRACTICAL COUNTERMEASURES", CRYPTOGRAPHIC HARDWARE AND EMBEDDED SYSTEMS. INTERNATIONALWORKSHOP, XX, XX, (20020813), pages 260 - 275, XP001160527 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * | [AD] - CIET AND M JOYE M, "Practical fault countermeasures for Chinese Remaindering based RSA (Extended Abstract)", FAULT DIAGNOSIS AND TOLERANCE IN CRYPTOGRAPHY FDTC 05,, (20050902), pages 121 - 131, XP007906966 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - YEN S-M ET AL, "HARDWARE FAULT ATTACK ON RSA WITH CRT REVISITED", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN; DE, (20021128), vol. 2587, ISSN 0302-9743, pages 374 - 388, XP001160549 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45675-9 | [A] - CHONG HEE KIM ET AL, "Fault Attacks for CRT Based RSA: New Attacks, New Results, and New Countermeasures", INFORMATION SECURITY THEORY AND PRACTICES. SMART CARDS, MOBILE AND UBIQUITOUS COMPUTING SYSTEMS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, (20070509), vol. 4462, ISBN 978-3-540-72353-0, pages 215 - 228, XP019058003 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5991415 | - BONEH, D.; DEMILLO, R.A.; LIPTON, R.J., "On the importance of checking cryptographic protocols for faults", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 1233, pages 37 - 51, XP008018071 | - JOYE, M.; LENSTRA, A.K.; QUISQUATER, J.J., "Chinese remaindering based cryptosystems in the presence of faults", JOURNAL OF CRYPTOLOGY: THE JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 12, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1007/s001459900055, pages 241 - 245, XP008026864 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s001459900055 | - SHAMIR, A, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROTECTING PUBLIC KEY SCHEMES FROM TIMING AND FAULT ATTACKS | - "Fault attacks on rsa with crt: Concrete results and practical countermeasures", AUMUIIER ET AL., Cryptographic Hardware and Embedded Systems ÔÇò CHES, LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 2523, pages 260 - 275 | - BLOMER, J.; OTTO, M.; SEIFERT, J.P., "A new crt-rsa algorithm secure against bellcore attacks", CCS '03: PROCEEDINGS OF THE 10TH ACM CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SECURITY, (2003), doi:doi:10.1145/948109.948151, pages 311 - 320, XP058194933 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/948109.948151 | - "Fault resistant rsa implementation", GIRAUD, C., 2nd Workshop on Fault Diagnosis and Tolerance in Cryptography - FDTC, (2005), pages 142 - 151 | - "How can we overcome both side channel analysis and fault attacks on rsa-crt", KIM, C.H.; QUISQUATER, J.J., FDTC, (2007), pages 21 - 29 | - "Gcd-free algorithms for computing modular inverses", JOYE, M.; PAILLIER, P., CHES, (2003), pages 243 - 253 | - "Rsa speedup with residue number system immune against hardware fault cryptanalysis", YEN, S.M. ET AL., ICISC '01: Proceedings of the 4th International Conference Seoul on Information Security and Cryptology, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (2002), pages 397 - 413 | - "The montgomery powering ladder", JOYE, M.; YEN, S., Cryptographic Hardware and Embedded Systems - CHES, (2002), vol. 2523, pages 291 - 302 | - DIFFIE, W.; HELLMAN, M.E., "New directions in cryptography", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (1976), vol. IT-22, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1109/TIT.1976.1055638, pages 644 - 654, XP000565260 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.1976.1055638 | - EI GAMAL, T., "A public-key cryptosystem and a signature scheme based on discrete logarithms", CRYPTO, (1984), pages 10 - 18 | - SCHNORR, C.P., "Efficient signature generation by smart cards", JOURNAL OF CRYPTOLOGY, (1991), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1007/BF00196725, pages 161 - 174, XP002006211 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00196725 | - DSA (National Institute of Standards and Technology: Digital Standard Signature. Federal Information Processing Standards Publications, (1994), page 186 | - "A study on the proposed korean digital signature algorithm", LIM, LEE, LNCS, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1998), pages 175 - 186 |