EP1965012 - Frame of a sliding door or window comprising sealing means acting on surfaces perpendicular and parallel to the sliding plane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norsk Hydro ASA Drammersveien 264, Vaekero 0240 Oslo / NO | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Portes, Mathieu 2 rue Alexandra David Neel Rés. Le Manoir Bàt. E 31100 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
Leroy, Jérôme Lotissement Loustal 6 rue du Pech 31190 Labruyère Dorsa / FR | 03 /
Clauzet, Robert 1 rue du 14 Juillet 1798 31120 Roquettes / FR | 04 /
Rebollar, Manuel C/. Infanta Catalina, 2 (Dúplex 1) Alcalá de Henares 28801 Madrid / ES | [2008/51] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
Portes, Mathieu 2 rue Alexandra David Neel Rés. Le Manoir Bàt. E 31100 Toulouse / FR | ||
02 /
Leroy, Jérôme Lotissement Loustal 6 rue du Pech 31190 Labruyère Dorsa / FR | |||
03 /
Clauzet, Robert 1 rue du 14 Juillet 1798 31120 Roquettes / FR | |||
04 /
Rebollar, Manuel 5 impasse de Bitet Appartement 27 31400 Toulouse / FR | Representative(s) | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Morelle, Guy Georges Alain Cabinet Morelle & Bardou S.C. 9 Avenue de l'Europe B.P. 72253 31522 Ramonville Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08352004.9 | 22.02.2008 | [2008/36] | Priority number, date | FR20070001297 | 23.02.2007 Original published format: FR 0701297 | [2008/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1965012 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1965012 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/46, E06B7/23 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
E06B7/2312 (EP);
E06B3/4609 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Title | German: | Rahmen einer Schiebetür oder eines Schiebefensters, der Dichtungsmittel umfasst, die auf parallel oder senkrecht zur Schiebeebene verlaufende Flächen einwirken | [2008/36] | English: | Frame of a sliding door or window comprising sealing means acting on surfaces perpendicular and parallel to the sliding plane | [2008/36] | French: | Châssis de porte ou fenètre coulissante comportant des moyens d'étanchéité agissant sur des surfaces parallèle et perpendiculaire au plan de coulissement | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2008 | CY | 01.06.2011 | CZ | 01.06.2011 | DK | 01.06.2011 | EE | 01.06.2011 | FI | 01.06.2011 | HR | 01.06.2011 | IE | 01.06.2011 | IT | 01.06.2011 | LT | 01.06.2011 | LV | 01.06.2011 | MT | 01.06.2011 | NL | 01.06.2011 | PL | 01.06.2011 | RO | 01.06.2011 | SE | 01.06.2011 | SI | 01.06.2011 | SK | 01.06.2011 | TR | 01.06.2011 | BG | 01.09.2011 | NO | 01.09.2011 | GR | 02.09.2011 | IS | 01.10.2011 | PT | 03.10.2011 | GB | 22.02.2012 | LU | 22.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
MT | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
GB | 22.02.2012 | ||
LU | 22.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
MT | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
GB | 22.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
MT | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
GB | 22.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
GB | 22.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
GB | 22.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
PL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
FI | 01.06.2011 | ||
HR | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 01.06.2011 | |
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NO | 01.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 01.06.2011 | |
NO | 01.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4185416 (WILMES RICHARD J [US]) [A] 1-4,7 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3225030 (HUEBNER GUMMI & KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1-4,7 * figures 1-3 * * claim 1 ** page 6 *; | [A]WO0026494 (JAMES HARDIE RES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 2-5 * figures 21a,21b * * page 16, line 4 - line 14 * * page 17, line 7 - line 22 *; | [X]GB2405898 (PARKFIELD SOUTH WEST LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7 * figure 4 * * claim 1 * * pages 2,4-7 *; | [A]EP1568843 (DAETWYLER AG [CH]) [A] 6 * figure 5 * * page 5, columns 7,8, paragraphs 30,31 * | by applicant | WO0026494 |