EP1955622 - Device for supplying water to the heating cavity of a household appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seb S.A. Les 4M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Seb SA Les 4M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allemand, Bernard 18Bis, Route des Forges Chateauneuf 39700 Dampierre / FR | [2011/36] |
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
Allemand, Bernard 18Bis, Route des Forges Chateauneuf 39700 Dampierre / FR | Representative(s) | Kiehl, Hubert SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Kiehl, Hubert SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/45] | Kiehl, Hubert SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/33] | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08356023.5 | 07.02.2008 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | FR20070000894 | 08.02.2007 Original published format: FR 0700894 | [2008/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955622 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955622 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/04 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
A47J37/0623 (EP);
A47J27/04 (EP);
A47J37/0664 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Title | German: | Wasserzuführungsvorrichtung in einem sich erhitzenden Hohlraum eines Haushaltsgeräts | [2008/33] | English: | Device for supplying water to the heating cavity of a household appliance | [2008/33] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en eau d'une cavité chauffante pour un appareil électromenager | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 24.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2008 | AT | 07.09.2011 | CY | 07.09.2011 | CZ | 07.09.2011 | DK | 07.09.2011 | EE | 07.09.2011 | FI | 07.09.2011 | HR | 07.09.2011 | IE | 07.09.2011 | IT | 07.09.2011 | LT | 07.09.2011 | LV | 07.09.2011 | MT | 07.09.2011 | NL | 07.09.2011 | PL | 07.09.2011 | RO | 07.09.2011 | SE | 07.09.2011 | SI | 07.09.2011 | SK | 07.09.2011 | TR | 07.09.2011 | BG | 07.12.2011 | NO | 07.12.2011 | GR | 08.12.2011 | ES | 18.12.2011 | IS | 07.01.2012 | PT | 09.01.2012 | LU | 07.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
TR | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
LU | 07.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
TR | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
MT | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
ES | 18.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
DK | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
IT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
NL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
IE | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
HR | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
LV | 07.09.2011 | ||
SE | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
NO | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0277337 (BUDERUS KUECHENTECHNIK [DE]) [DA] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]EP0374863 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2398433 | EP0277337 | FR2814734 |