EP2169134 - Sleeve for walls and hollow blocks and assembling method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceramica Acustica, S. L. Artesanos, 14 28660 Boadilla del Monte (Madrid) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Ceramica Acustica, S. L. Artesanaos, 14 28660 Boadilla del Monte (Madrid) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riesco Prieto, D. Fernando Apdo. Correos no. 17 49700 Corrales del Vino (Zamora) / ES | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Manzano Cantos, Gregorio Cabinet Manzano Avda. Pedro Diez, 21 Duplicado 1° Oficina 9 28019 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Manzano Cantos, Gregorio Cabinet Manzano Embajadores, 55 28012 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 08380281.9 | 29.09.2008 | [2010/13] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169134 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04C1/39 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
E04C1/397 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Hülse für Mauern und Hohlblöcke und Montageverfahren | [2010/13] | English: | Sleeve for walls and hollow blocks and assembling method | [2010/13] | French: | Passe-tube pour des cloisons en briques creuses et forme de montage | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 22.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2010 | 30.09.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1808541 (CERAMICA ACUSTICA S L [ES]) [A] 1,5,7,9 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1,6,7,12 *; | [AD]FR2755713 (IND REGIONALE BATIMENT [FR]) [AD] 1,5,7,9 * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 4; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | EP1808541 | FR2755713 |