EP2098500 - Salts of menantine and cox-inhibitors and their crystal form in the treatment of pain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratorios del Dr. Esteve, S.A. Avda Mare de Deu de Montserrat 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states Laboratorios Del. Dr. Esteve, S.A. Avda Mare de Deu de Montserrat 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buschmann, Helmut, Heinrich, Dr. Sperberweg 15 52076 Aachen (Walheim) / DE | 02 /
Tesson, Nicolas Enantia S.L. C/. Baldiri Reixac, 10 08028 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
Farran, Joan Enantia S.L. C/. Baldiri Reixac, 10 08028 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
Rafecas, Llorenc Enantia S.L. C/. Baldiri Reixac, 10 08028 Barcelona / ES | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Peters, Hajo, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Peters, Hajo, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08384002.5 | 07.03.2008 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2098500 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C57/40, C07C63/70, C07C65/01, C07C211/38, A61K31/13, A61K31/192, A61P25/02, A61P29/00, A61P25/28 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
C07C57/58 (EP,US);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07C211/38 (EP,US);
C07C57/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/19] |
Former [2009/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Menantinsalze und Cox-Hemmer sowie ihre Kristallform in der Schmerzbehandlung | [2009/37] | English: | Salts of menantine and cox-inhibitors and their crystal form in the treatment of pain | [2009/37] | French: | Sels de Ménantine et co-inhibiteur et leur forme cristalline pour le traitement de la douleur | [2009/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/41] | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5157151 (ANGRES ISAAC [US]) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005288375 (HOBDEN ADRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * claim 5 * |