EP2090527 - Blister packaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3A Technology & Management AG Badischer Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2010/23] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Alcan Technology & Management Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pasbrig, Erwin Obere Beugen 24 78224 Singen / DE | [2009/34] | Application number, filing date | 08405049.1 | 18.02.2008 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2090527 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/36, B65D75/34, // A61J1/03 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
B65D75/327 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/10 (EP);
B32B27/16 (EP);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/28 (EP);
B32B27/30 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B32B29/005 (EP);
B32B3/30 (EP);
B32B7/05 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/12 (EP);
B32B2255/20 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2307/50 (EP);
B32B2307/71 (EP);
B32B2307/7242 (EP);
B32B2307/7244 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (EP);
B32B2307/7248 (EP);
B32B2307/75 (EP);
B32B2439/80 (EP);
B32B2555/00 (EP);
B65D2585/56 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/17] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Blisterverpackung | [2009/34] | English: | Blister packaging | [2009/34] | French: | Emballage alvéolé | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3333393 (SPARKS GEORGE C) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 43; figure -- *; | [XA]US6086988 (VAN BEEK HARRY J G [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * * column 1, lines 60-67 * * column 3, line 54 - column 8, line 22 * [A] 2; | [X]EP0613832 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10138863 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * |