EP2153982 - Foamed plastic board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): HR | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3A Technology & Management AG Badischer Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2010/23] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Alcan Technology & Management Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Thomas Hubelstrasse 4c 6204 Sempach / CH | 02 /
Moritz, Pieper Seestrasse 9 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Gernet, Samuel Andreas, et al Gernet Althaus IP AG Querstrasse 5 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Gernet, Samuel Andreas, et al Suisse Technology Partners Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Application number, filing date | 08405190.3 | 30.07.2008 | [2010/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2153982 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2153982 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/18, B32B3/30, B32B5/18 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
B32B5/32 (EP,US);
B29C65/20 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/435 (EP,US);
B29C66/45 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/81435 (EP,US);
B32B3/12 (EP,US);
B32B3/18 (EP,US);
B32B3/266 (EP,US);
B32B3/30 (EP,US);
B32B7/05 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US);
B29C66/7394 (EP,US);
B29C66/832 (EP,US);
B32B2266/0207 (EP,US);
B32B2266/0214 (EP,US);
B32B2266/08 (EP,US);
B32B2603/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/08 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2055/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/003 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/006 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/12 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | Geschäumte Kunststoffplatte | [2010/07] | English: | Foamed plastic board | [2010/07] | French: | Plaque en matière synthétique expansée | [2010/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 30.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | HR | 11.05.2011 | HU | 11.05.2011 | LT | 11.05.2011 | LV | 11.05.2011 | MT | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | [2013/51] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
HU | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/27] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
MT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 11.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1393892 (ALCAN TECH & MAN LTD [CH]); | [A]EP1536944 (ALCAN TECH & MAN LTD [CH]) | by applicant | EP1536944 |