EP2108930 - Contact-less device for measuring operating parameters of rotors of high-speed rotary machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | 24.02.2017 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2012/24] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Italia S.p.A. Via Piero Gobetti 2/C 20063 Cernusco Sul Naviglio (MI) / IT | ||
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Italia S.p.A. Via Piero Gobetti 2/C 20063 Cernusco Sul Navaglio (MI) / IT | ||
Former [2009/42] | For all designated states VARIAN S.p.A. Via Varian 54 10040 Leini' (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bottauscio, Oriano Via Madama Cristina, 107 10126 Torino / IT | 02 /
Chiampi, Mario Corso Regina Margherita, 272 10144 Torino / IT | 03 /
Crotti, Gabriella Via Caboto, 38 10129 Torino / IT | 04 /
Fiorillo, Fausto Via Nazionale, 70 10064 Pinerolo (TO) / IT | 05 /
Giors, Silvio Via Audello, 46 10072 Caselle (TO) / IT | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Robba, Pierpaolo Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 08425236.0 | 09.04.2008 | [2009/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2108930 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01K7/38, G01K13/08, F04D27/00, F04D19/04 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
G01K7/38 (EP,US);
F04D19/042 (EP,US);
F04D27/001 (EP,US);
G01K13/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/42] | G01K7/38, F04D19/04, G01K13/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/25] |
Former [2009/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Berührungslose Messeinrichtung zum Messen von Parametern eines Rotors einer schnell rotierenden Maschine | [2009/42] | English: | Contact-less device for measuring operating parameters of rotors of high-speed rotary machines | [2009/42] | French: | Dispositif de mesure sans contact de paramètres de rotors de machines ayant une grande vitesse de rotation | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 16.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1359574 (DAVALL SONS LTD S SOMERVELL R, et al) [X] 1-11,14 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,15-19; | [DA]GB2261518 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [DA] 14 * abstract ** pages 3-4 *; | [DY]US2007127551 (CONRAD ARMIN [DE]) [DY] 12,13,15-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB1359574 |