EP1980179 - A sofa in two sections suitable to take different configurations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arketipo S.p.A. Viale Volta 101 50100 Firenze / IT | [2010/21] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states ARKETIPO S.r.l. Viale Volta, 101 50131 Firenze / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piazzesi Adriano Via F. da Barberino 17 50133 Firenze / IT | 02 /
Lorusso Massimo Via Mercati 75 50139 Firenze / IT | 03 /
Docquier Rose-Marie Via San Cresci 54 50022 Greve in Chianti, Firenze / IT | [2009/51] |
Former [2008/42] | 01 /
Piazzesi Adriano Via F. da Barberino 17 50133 Firenze / IT | ||
02 /
Lorusso Massimo Via Mercati 75 50139 Firenze / IT | |||
03 /
Docquier Rose-Marie Via San Cresci 54 50022 Greve in chianti, Firenze / IT | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 08425246.9 | 11.04.2008 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | IT2007FI00092 | 13.04.2007 Original published format: IT FI20070092 | [2008/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1980179 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1980179 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47C17/18 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
A47C17/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Title | German: | Sofa mit zwei für verschiedene Anordnungen geeigneten Abschnitten | [2008/42] | English: | A sofa in two sections suitable to take different configurations | [2008/42] | French: | Sofa en deux parties approprié pour différentes configurations | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.06.2010 | CZ | 02.06.2010 | DK | 02.06.2010 | EE | 02.06.2010 | FI | 02.06.2010 | HR | 02.06.2010 | HU | 02.06.2010 | LT | 02.06.2010 | LV | 02.06.2010 | MT | 02.06.2010 | PL | 02.06.2010 | PT | 02.06.2010 | RO | 02.06.2010 | SE | 02.06.2010 | SI | 02.06.2010 | SK | 02.06.2010 | TR | 02.06.2010 | BG | 02.09.2010 | NO | 02.09.2010 | GR | 03.09.2010 | IS | 02.10.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PT | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
TR | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.09.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PT | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 02.09.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
Former [2013/32] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
PT | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
MT | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 02.06.2010 | |
CZ | 02.06.2010 | ||
DK | 02.06.2010 | ||
EE | 02.06.2010 | ||
FI | 02.06.2010 | ||
HR | 02.06.2010 | ||
LT | 02.06.2010 | ||
LV | 02.06.2010 | ||
PL | 02.06.2010 | ||
RO | 02.06.2010 | ||
SE | 02.06.2010 | ||
SI | 02.06.2010 | ||
SK | 02.06.2010 | ||
NO | 02.09.2010 | ||
GR | 03.09.2010 | ||
IS | 02.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB799315 (LEN LTD) [A] 1-6* figures 1-8 *; | [A]DE19532820 (LIEBERKNECHT A [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]DE20100463U (BALI SCHAUMSTOFF GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X]EP1464256 (ARKETIPO S P A [IT]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1 - column 2 * * figure - * | by applicant | EP1118295 |