EP2149767 - Heat pump device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMAT S.p.A. Via P. Zorutti 14/16 33074 Fontanafredda Pordenone / IT | [2010/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Driussi, Diego Via Trentino 20/7 33080 Porcia, Pordenone / IT | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Giugni, Valter, et al Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2010/05] | Application number, filing date | 08425513.2 | 28.07.2008 | [2010/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2149767 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F25B40/06 | [2010/05] | CPC: |
F25B40/06 (EP,US);
D06F58/206 (EP,US);
F25B30/06 (EP);
F25B2400/01 (EP);
F25B2700/21152 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/40] |
Former [2010/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmepumpenvorrichtung | [2010/05] | English: | Heat pump device | [2010/05] | French: | Dispositif de pompe à chaleur | [2010/05] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1650343 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0024] - [0030]; figure 1 * [Y] 2-6,9; | [Y]JP2001110556 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 2-4,6 * abstract *; | [Y]US2007000269 (MONGIA RAJIV K [US]) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018]; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102006054828 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [Y] 9 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]JP2001091065 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract *; | [X]JP2000274842 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]JPH11245655 (CALSONIC CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]EP1632736 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |