EP2151559 - Injection device for injecting a reducing substance into an exhaust system of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/06] | Injection device for injcecting a reducing substance into an exhaust system of an internal combustion engine | ||
[2010/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magneti Marelli S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti 61/63 Corbetta (MI) / IT | [2011/04] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Magneti Marelli Powertrain S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti, 61/63 28011 Corbetta / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cominetti, Paolo Via Bonci, 6 40137 Bologna / IT | 02 /
Osbat, Giovanni Via Caduti di Toranello, 37 48025 Riolo Terme / IT | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 08425562.9 | 08.08.2008 | [2010/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151559 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2151559 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2151559 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N9/00 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
F01N11/00 (EP);
F01N3/208 (EP);
F01N2550/05 (EP);
F01N2610/02 (EP);
F01N2610/08 (EP);
F01N2610/14 (EP);
F01N2610/144 (EP);
F01N2610/1453 (EP);
F01N2610/1493 (EP);
F01N2900/0422 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2010/41] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einspritzvorrichtung zum Einspritzen einer Verringerungssubstanz in ein Abgassystem in einem Verbrennungsmotor | [2010/06] | English: | Injection device for injecting a reducing substance into an exhaust system of an internal combustion engine | [2010/20] | French: | Dispositif d'injection pour l'injection d'une substance réductrice dans un système d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2010/06] |
Former [2010/06] | Injection device for injcecting a reducing substance into an exhaust system of an internal combustion engine | Examination procedure | 23.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 11.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005005799 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,9 * page 10, line 6 - page 11, line 34; figure 1 * * abstract *; | [X]WO2008006840 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE], et al) [X] 1 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 4; figure 1 * * page 5, lines 11-17 * * abstract *; | [A]US2005252201 (LECEA OSCAR A [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5 * columns 10-23,28; figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]WO2008058977 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2006074833 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |