EP1967623 - Circular loom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STARLINGER & CO. GESELLSCHAFT MBH Sonnenuhrgasse 4 1060 Wien / AT | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fürst, Herbert Wiesengasse 8 2564 Weissenbach/Triesting / AT | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2008/37] | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Wipplingerstrase 30 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 08450023.0 | 28.02.2008 | [2008/37] | Priority number, date | AT20070000363 | 07.03.2007 Original published format: AT 3632007 | [2008/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1967623 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1967623 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D03D37/00, D03C7/00 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
D03D37/00 (EP);
D03C7/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2015/08] |
Former [2008/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rundwebmaschine | [2008/37] | English: | Circular loom | [2008/37] | French: | Métier à tisser circulaire | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 19.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2051894 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1020371 (SOCIETE ANONYME IWAN SIMONIS) [A] 1-15 * page 1, lines 32-52; figures 1-25 *; | [A]FR1347072 (IWAN SIMONIS SA) [A] 1-5 * page 1, column l, lines 1-25 * * page 2, column l, line 52 - page 3, column r, line 43; figures 1-19 *; | [A]AT386847B (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0057237 | EP0786026 | US4846229 |