EP2008768 - Device for preparing windows and doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hrachowina Bauelemente-Porduktions-Ges.m.b.h. Am Langen Felde 55 1220 Wien / AT | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hrachowina, Alexander Haubenbiglstrasse 13 1190 Wien / AT | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Andreas Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Rippel, Andreas Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 08450093.3 | 24.06.2008 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | AT20070000401 | 27.06.2007 Original published format: AT 4012007 | [2009/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2008768 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q41/02, B27M1/08 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
B27M1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Title | German: | Anlage zur Fertigung von Fenster und Türen | [2009/01] | English: | Device for preparing windows and doors | [2009/01] | French: | Installation de fabrication de fenêtres et de portes | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 07.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/14] | 04.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3615978 (WACO JONSEREDS AB [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0376918 (BINDER HANS [AT]) [A] 3* column 8, line 46 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0891847 (SCM GROUP AUTEC DIVISION SPA [IT]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 29 - line 50 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]DE19918004 (ZEHENDER JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 2 - line 36; figure 1 * [Y] 3; | [A]US2003209318 (HENTHORN JOHN R [US]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0070]; figures 6a,6b * | Examination | EP1900477 |