EP2052999 - Baffle tube for a plastic granulate transported by air flow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECON GmbH Biergasse 9 4616 Weisskirchen/Traun / AT | [2011/14] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states ECON Maschinenbau und Steuerungstechnik Gmbh Biergasse 9 4616 Weisskirchen/Traun / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hehenberger, Gerhard Eggendorf 108 4622 Eggendorf / AT | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 08450162.6 | 22.10.2008 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | AT20070001714 | 23.10.2007 Original published format: AT 17142007 | [2009/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052999 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052999 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65G53/52 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
B65G53/521 (EP);
B29B9/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Title | German: | Umlenkführung ein mit Hilfe eines Luftstroms gefördertes Kunststoffgranulat | [2009/18] | English: | Baffle tube for a plastic granulate transported by air flow | [2009/18] | French: | Déflecteur dans un convoyeur à air pour granulés | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.11.2010 | CZ | 17.11.2010 | DK | 17.11.2010 | EE | 17.11.2010 | FI | 17.11.2010 | HR | 17.11.2010 | HU | 17.11.2010 | IE | 17.11.2010 | IT | 17.11.2010 | LT | 17.11.2010 | LV | 17.11.2010 | MT | 17.11.2010 | NL | 17.11.2010 | PL | 17.11.2010 | RO | 17.11.2010 | SE | 17.11.2010 | SI | 17.11.2010 | SK | 17.11.2010 | TR | 17.11.2010 | BG | 17.02.2011 | NO | 17.02.2011 | GR | 18.02.2011 | ES | 28.02.2011 | IS | 17.03.2011 | PT | 17.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
TR | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
MT | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
HR | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
NL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
NO | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE415794 (F. SCHMIDT) [X] 1-5 * page 3, paragraph 2; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]GB191511590 (CRAMP WILLIAM, et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 * * the whole document *; | [A]US1681381 (TOLMAN JR EDGAR B) [A] 1* figure 3 *; | [X]US1724625 (SWEENY ROBERT P) [X] 1 * figures 2,3 * * the whole document *; | [X]US2310265 (SWEENY ROBERT P) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * the whole document *; | [X]GB731646 (MIAG MUEHLENBAU & IND GMBH) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 90-94; figure 4 *; | [A]FR2238656 (REFACCIONARIA DE MOLINOS SA [MX]) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 4 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4116491 (PLY LEMUEL LESLIE) [A] 1 * column 3, paragraph 3 * * figure 2 *; | [X]NL7805843 (HANDLEMAN AVROM RINGLE) [X] 1 * page 4, line 16 * * page 5, lines 27-32 * * page 11, lines 10-13 * * figure 2 * | by applicant | WO9315892 |