EP2138433 - Roller and a method of its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LINTER Spólka z o.o. Lobzów 163 32-340 Wolbrom / PL | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Habryn, Andrzej 32-340 Wolbrom Os.Lokietka 9/16 / PL | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Karczmitowicz, Teresa Ewa Kancelaria OPTIMAS Ul. Krakowska 259 A 32-080 Zabierzów / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Karczmitowicz, Teresa Ewa Kancelaria OPTIMAS Ul. Krakowska 259 A 32-080 Zabierzów / PL | ||
Former [2010/01] | Karczmitowicz, Teresa Ewa Kancelaria OPTIMAS ul. Lenartowicza 21/7 30-038 Kraków / PL | Application number, filing date | 08460027.9 | 27.06.2008 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2138433 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65G39/04 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B65G39/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Rolle und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2010/01] | English: | Roller and a method of its manufacture | [2010/01] | French: | Rouleau et son procédé de fabrication | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 07.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/32] | 23.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2528116 (CLEMSON RICHARD D) [X] 1-7,9-15 * column 3, lines 42-70 * * column 4, lines 2-9,64- - column 5, lines 4,12-28; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US3416638 (BUCK RICHARD D) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-15 * column 2, lines 52-67 * * column 3, lines 35-51,65-67; figures 1-8 *; | [X]AU2007100380 (HONG CHUNG INDUSTRIAL CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1,3-8,12-14 * page 4, lines 21-26; figure 2 *; | [X]US2817940 (LORIG EDWIN T) [X] 1,3-8 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, lines 2,14-17; figures 1,7 * * column 3, lines 54-60 * * column 4, lines 1-8 *; | [DX]PL189397B (KRAWCZYK JAROSLAW [PL]; KRAWCZYK PRZEMYSLAW [PL]; KRAWCZYK WIKTOR [PL]) [DX] 1,2,4,6-8 * figure 4 *; | [DX]PL170870B (GLOWNY INSTYTUT GORNICTWA [PL]) [DX] 1,3-5,7,8 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2034148 (AMECO SA) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 1; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO02074665 | GB2200719 | WO2008060176 | RU2291095 | GB1221520 | US2008078648 | EP0897882 | US5383549 | US5372230 | RU2224704 | RU2224705 | PL170870B | PL189397B | US2528116 | US3416638 | US2817940 |