EP2117729 - MECHANICALLY RESPONSIVE SUPPORTED POLYELECTROLYTE MULTILAYER FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université de Strasbourg 4, rue Blaise Pascal 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Université de Strasbourg 4, rue Blaise Pascal 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAVALLE, Philippe 1 rue de la boîte à bougies F-67100 Strasbourg / FR | 02 /
HEMMERLE, Joseph 44 rue Baldung-Grien F-67720 Weyersheim / FR | 03 /
MERTZ, Damien 5 rue du Falkenstein F-67800 Hoenheim / FR | 04 /
SCHAAF, Pierre 5 rue Poudrière F-67120 Molsheim / FR | 05 /
VOEGEL, Jean-Claude 10 rue des Flaques F-67210 Valff / FR | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08702347.9 | 31.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008IB00218 | Priority number, date | EP20070290126 | 31.01.2007 Original published format: EP 07290126 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008093222 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117729 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/04, B05D1/18, B05D1/36, A61K9/70, C08J7/04 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
B05D7/56 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
B05D7/52 (EP,US);
A61K9/7007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | MECHANISCH BEEINFLUSSBARE TRÄGERUNTERSTÜTZTE MEHRSCHICHTIGE POLYELEKTROLYTFILME | [2009/47] | English: | MECHANICALLY RESPONSIVE SUPPORTED POLYELECTROLYTE MULTILAYER FILMS | [2009/47] | French: | FILMS MULTICOUCHES DE POLYÉLECTROLYTIQUES SUPPORTÉS, SENSIBLES MÉCANIQUEMENT | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 26.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/36] | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1733718 (UNIV GENT [BE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037]; example -; claim - * | [DA] - J.M.GARZA ET AL., "Multicomponent Films Made of Alternate Polyelectrolyte Multilayers of Exponential and Linear Growth", LANGMUIR, Internet, (20040721), vol. 20, pages 7298 - 7302, XP002442749 [DA] 1-18 * figures 1-3 * * page 7302 - Conclusion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la049106o | [A] - CONSTANT VODOUHE ET AL., "Control of drug accessability on functional polyelectrolyte multilayer films", BIOMATERIALS, Internet, (20060404), vol. 27, pages 4149 - 4156, XP005402078 [A] 1-18 * 3. Results and discussion *; page 4151 - page 4154 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2006.03.024 | [A] - ALEXEI A. ANTIPOV AND GLEB B. SUKHORUKOV, "Polyelectrolyte multilayer capsules as vehicles with tunable permeability", ADVANCES IN COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, Internet, (20041007), vol. 111, pages 49 - 61, XP004663187 [A] 1-18 * Chapters 3. and 4. Permeability for low or high molecular weight compounds and 5. Conclusions *; page 52 - page 60 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cis.2004.07.006 | [A] - J.HEMMERLE ET AL., "Mechanically Responsive Films of Varible Hydrophobicity Made of Polyelectrolyte Multilayers", LANGMUIR, Internet, (20051013), vol. 21, pages 10328 - 10331, XP002442750 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la052157g | [A] - J.D.MENDELSOHN ET AL., "Fabrication of Microporous Thin Films from Polyelectrolyte Multilayers", LANGMUIR, Internet, (20000429), vol. 16, pages 5017 - 5023, XP002442752 [A] 1-18 * Conclusions *; page 5022 - page 5023; figures 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la000075g |