EP2135207 - ANIMATED CONNECTION PAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUHONEN, Ahti Holperintie 39 FI-04680 Hirvihaara / FI | 02 /
SNYDER, Matthew 1802- 2668 Ash Street Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z4K4 / CA | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Tognetty, Virpi Maria Nokia Corporation IPR Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 08702372.7 | 31.01.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008IB00304 | Priority number, date | US20070683828 | 08.03.2007 Original published format: US 683828 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008107747 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2135207 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0277 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | ANIMIERTE VERBINDUNGSSEITE | [2009/52] | English: | ANIMATED CONNECTION PAGE | [2009/52] | French: | PAGE DE CONNEXION ANIMÉE | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 28.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [L] - The technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 15 PCT) are considered part of common general knowledge. Due to their notoriety no documentary evidence is found to be required. For further details see the accompanying Opinion and the reference below., XP002456414 [L] 1-22 |