EP2121260 - CUTTING DISK FOR FORMING A SCRIBED LINE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/48] | CUTTING DISK FOR FORMING A SCRIBED LINE | ||
[2013/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Awin Diamond Technology Corporation 6F. No., 156, Sec. 1 Wenxing Road Zhubei City Hsinchu County 302 Taiwan / CN | [2014/03] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Mintres B.V. De Nieuwe Erven 8 5431 NT Cuijk / NL | ||
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Dutch Diamond Technologies B.V. De Nieuwe Erven 6 5431 NT Cuijk / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Xiao Kloosterlaan 3 NL-5435 XD St Agatha / NL | 02 /
GODFRIED, Herman Philip Van der Boechorststraat 88 NL-1081 BW Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
KRIELE, Paulus Adrianus Cornelis Koestraat 14 NL-5451 PH Mill / NL | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Detken, Andreas Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 08702475.8 | 21.01.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008IB50204 | Priority number, date | ZA20070000584 | 19.01.2007 Original published format: ZA 200700584 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008087612 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121260 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121260 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/22, C03B33/10 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B28D1/225 (EP);
C03B33/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEPLATTE ZUR FORMUNG EINER SCHREIBSPUR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2013/33] | English: | CUTTING DISK FOR FORMING A SCRIBED LINE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2013/33] | French: | DISQUE DE COUPE POUR TRAÇAGE D'UNE LIGNE DE DÉCOUPE ET MÉTHODE POUR SA FABRICATION. | [2013/39] |
Former [2009/48] | SCHNEIDEPLATTE ZUR FORMUNG EINER SCHREIBSPUR | ||
Former [2009/48] | CUTTING DISK FOR FORMING A SCRIBED LINE | ||
Former [2009/48] | DISQUE DE COUPE POUR TRAÇAGE D'UNE LIGNE DE DÉCOUPE | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2008 | AT | 12.02.2014 | BE | 12.02.2014 | BG | 12.02.2014 | CY | 12.02.2014 | CZ | 12.02.2014 | DK | 12.02.2014 | EE | 12.02.2014 | FI | 12.02.2014 | HR | 12.02.2014 | LT | 12.02.2014 | LV | 12.02.2014 | MC | 12.02.2014 | MT | 12.02.2014 | PL | 12.02.2014 | RO | 12.02.2014 | SE | 12.02.2014 | SI | 12.02.2014 | SK | 12.02.2014 | TR | 12.02.2014 | NO | 12.05.2014 | GR | 13.05.2014 | IS | 12.06.2014 | PT | 12.06.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.02.2014 | |
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2006009113 (MITSUBOSHI DIAMOND IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-11 * abstract * * figures 5,6 * [Y] 2,15,19,20; | [PX]EP1779988 (MITSUBOSHI DIAMOND IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,3,4,7-11 * page 3, lines 41-46 * * page 6, line 54 - page 7, line 25 * * page 10, lines 14-21 * * figures 5,6 *; | [YA]US2003159297 (CHAE KYUNG-SU [KR]) [Y] 2 * column W * [A] 1,19,20; | [DYA]EP1092686 (MITSUBOSHI DIAMOND IND CO LTD [JP]) [DY] 15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] * * figures 2-5,8-14 * [A] 1,19,20; | [YA]WO2004082906 (SHINHANDIAMOND IND CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 19,20 * page 6, lines 14-26 * * page 7, lines 4-16 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 27 * * figures 2,4 * [A] 1; | [PX]JP2007152936 (NIKKEN DIA KK) [PX] 1-4,6,8,12,19,20 * the whole document *; | [PA]JP2007031200 (ALLIED MATERIAL CORP) [PA] 1,15,17,19,20 * abstract * * figures 1a,1b,2 * | by applicant | WO2006009113 | US2003159297 |