EP2111862 - PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCT FOR PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DEMENTIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagoya City University 1, Aza Kawasumi, Mizuho-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8601 / JP | For all designated states Kowa Company, Ltd. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460-8625 / JP | [2009/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OJIKA, Kosei c/o GRADUATE SCHOOL OF MEDICAL SCIENCES NAGOYA CITY UNIVERSITY 1 Aza Kawasumi Mizuho-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8601 / JP | 02 /
MATSUKAWA, Noriyuki c/o GRADUATE SCHOOL OF MEDICAL SCIENCES NAGOYA CITY UNIVERSITY 1 Aza Kawasumi Mizuho-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8601 / JP | [2009/44] | Representative(s) | Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Godemeyer Blum Lenze - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | Polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | Application number, filing date | 08702800.7 | 22.01.2008 | [2009/44] | WO2008JP00059 | Priority number, date | JP20070012671 | 23.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007012671 | [2009/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008090736 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2111862 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61K31/19, A61P25/28, A61P43/00, A61K45/06 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/19 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2009/44] | A61K31/445, A61K31/19, A61P25/28, A61P43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHES PRODUKT ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS ALZHEIMER | [2009/44] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCT FOR PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DEMENTIA | [2009/44] | French: | PRODUIT PHARMACEUTIQUE DESTINÉ À LA PRÉVENTION ET AU TRAITEMENT DE LA DÉMENCE D'ALZHEIMER | [2009/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2009 | Translation filed | 15.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 21.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 02.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - BORKOWSKA A ET AL, "P.5.a.005 Possible benefits of valproate addition to donepezil treatment in Alzheimer's disease", EUROPEAN NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 16, ISSN 0924-977X, (20060101), page S478, (20060101), XP025110615 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-977X(06)70636-8 | [Y] - ROGERS S L ET AL, "Donepezil improves cognition and global function in Alzheimer disease: a 15-week, double-blind, placebo-controlled study. Donepezil Study Group.", ARCHIVES OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, (19980511), vol. 158, no. 9, ISSN 0003-9926, pages 1021 - 1031, XP002571051 [Y] 1-7 * page 1021, column 2, paragraph 2 * | [A] - HOLDS W ET AL, "ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE UPDATE: USING WHAT WE NOW KNOW TO HELP PATIENTS", PC CONSULTANT, PTHE NETWORK, OLYMPIA, WA, US, (19990301), vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0749-6699, pages 675 - 678,684/6, XP000892762 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 684, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 3, paragraph 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH10324626 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO) | [Y] - TOGO T., "Chiho no Yakubutsu Ryoho", SEISHIN IGAKU, (2004), vol. 46, no. 2, pages 124 - 132, XP008110075 | [Y] - PROFENNO L. ET AL., "A Randomized, Double-Blind, Placebo-Controlled Pilot Trial of Safety and Tolerability of Two Doses of Divalproex Sodium in Outpatients with Probable Alzheimer's Disease", CURRENT ALZHEIMER RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 553 - 558, XP008110058 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/156720505774932205 | by applicant | JPH10324626 | - JOURNAL OF THE JAPAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, (2006), vol. 58, no. 7, pages 861 - 864 | - N. ENGL. J. MED., (2006), vol. 355, no. 15, page 1525 | - AM. J. GERIATR. PSYCHIATRY, (2005), vol. 13, no. 11, page 942 |