EP2083305 - BINOCULAR TELESCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Vision Co., Ltd. 3-25 Futaba 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-0043 / JP | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Mitsuo c/o Nikon Corporation Intellectual Property Headquarter 2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | WESER & Kollegen Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/31] | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08703324.7 | 09.01.2008 | [2009/31] | WO2008JP50464 | Priority number, date | JP20070003570 | 11.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007003570 | JP20070003572 | 11.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007003572 | [2009/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008084871 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2083305 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/04, G02B23/18, G02B7/06 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
G02B7/04 (EP,US);
G02B23/18 (EP,US);
G02B7/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/31] | G02B23/06, G02B7/06, G02B23/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | BINOKULARES TELESKOP | [2009/31] | English: | BINOCULAR TELESCOPE | [2009/31] | French: | TÉLÉSCOPE BINOCULAIRE | [2015/23] |
Former [2009/31] | TÉLESCOPE BINOCULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2009 | Translation filed | 23.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 08.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 03.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6008937 (YANO TAKAAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 14; figure 1 * [Y] 3; | [XY]JP2000206420 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0033] , [0035] , [0040] - [0045]; figures 1,5 *[Y] 3 | International search | [X]JPH08194166 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD); | [X]JPH10197776 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11202383 (MINOLTA CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000056237 (SWAROVSKI OPTIK KG); | [A]JP2000249930 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [XP]JP2007127690 (DEON KOGAKU GIKEN KK) | Examination | US2006033990 | by applicant | US6008937 | JP2000206420 | US2006033990 |