EP2116560 - POLYESTER, COMPOSITION THEREOF AND FILM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Limited 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINOSHITA, Eiji c/o Teijin DuPont Films Japan Limited 1357 Minamijo Anpachi-cho Anpachi-gun Gifu 503-0123 / JP | 02 /
KISHINO, Tomoyuki c/o Matsuyama Factory Teijin Limited 77 Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime 791-8041 / JP | 03 /
KOHNO, Kazuteru c/o Iwakuni Research Center Teijin Limited 2-1 Hinodecho Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP | 04 /
OGAWA, Tatsuya c/o Matsuyama Factory Teijin Limited 77 Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime 791-8041 / JP | [2012/02] |
Former [2009/46] | 01 /
KINOSHITA, Eiji c/o Teijin DuPont Films Japan Limited 1357 Minamijo Anpachi-cho Anpachi-gun Gifu 503-0123 / JP | ||
02 /
KISHINO, Tomoyuki c/o Matsuyama Factory Teijin Limited 77 Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime 791-8041 / JP | |||
03 /
KOHNO, Kazuteru c/o Iwakuni Research Center Teijin Limited 2-1 Hinodecho Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi 740-0014 / JP | |||
04 /
OGAWA, Tatsuya c/o Matsuyama Factory Teijin Limited 77 Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime 791-8041 / JP | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08703850.1 | 18.01.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008JP51023 | Priority number, date | JP20070025455 | 05.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007025455 | JP20070025456 | 05.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007025456 | JP20070025457 | 05.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007025457 | JP20070173801 | 02.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007173801 | [2009/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008096612 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2116560 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2116560 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/672, C08J5/18, C08L67/02, G11B5/73 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
C08G63/187 (EP,US);
C08G63/672 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/365 (KR);
B32B7/022 (KR);
B32B7/023 (KR);
B32B7/025 (KR);
B32B7/027 (KR);
C08G63/189 (KR);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08L25/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/025 (KR);
C08L67/03 (KR);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
G11B5/73 (KR);
G11B5/73927 (EP,US);
G11B5/73929 (EP,US);
H05K1/0373 (EP,KR,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,KR,US);
H05K2201/0145 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | POLYESTER, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAVON UND FOLIE DARAUS | [2009/46] | English: | POLYESTER, COMPOSITION THEREOF AND FILM THEREOF | [2009/46] | French: | POLYESTER, ET COMPOSITION ET FILM DUDIT POLYESTER | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2009 | Translation filed | 07.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 22.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2008 | AT | 11.01.2012 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | HR | 11.01.2012 | IT | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | MT | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | IE | 18.01.2012 | LU | 18.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | NO | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | ES | 22.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
LU | 18.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
HR | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NO | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1734067 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 10-21* paragraphs [0026] - [0029] - [0033]; claims 7,8; table 2 * | International search | [A]JPS60221420 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPS61143425 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPH06145323 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPH08109318 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JPS60135428 | JPS60221420 | JPS61145724 | JPH06145323 |