EP2110558 - MULTI-STAGE HIGH-PRESSURE PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERAGAKI, Akio c/o Ebara Corporation 11-1 Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2009/43] | 01 /
TERAGAKI, Akio c/o Ebara Corporation 11-1 Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8510 / JP | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [2022/41] |
Former [2016/20] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/43] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08703945.9 | 21.01.2008 | [2009/43] | WO2008JP51133 | Priority number, date | JP20070011315 | 22.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007011315 | [2009/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008090994 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110558 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110558 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2110558 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/12, F04D1/08, F16J15/34, F04D29/10, F04D7/06, F04D1/06 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
F16J15/3404 (EP,US);
F04D1/063 (EP,US);
F04D29/108 (EP,US);
F04D7/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/43] | F04D29/12, F04D1/08, F16J15/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/20] |
Former [2009/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFIGE HOCHDRUCKPUMPE | [2009/43] | English: | MULTI-STAGE HIGH-PRESSURE PUMP | [2009/43] | French: | POMPE À HAUTE PRESSION À PLUSIEURS ÉTAGES | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2009 | Translation filed | 21.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 21.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15174721.9 / EP2955385 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.2017
ADMISSIBLE Sulzer Management AG Neuwiesenstrasse 15 8401 Winterthur / CH Opponent's representative IPS Irsch AG Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.2017
ADMISSIBLE Sulzer Management AG Neuwiesenstrasse 15 8401 Winterthur / CH Opponent's representative Intellectual Property Services GmbH Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | 29.03.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.10.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.01.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.01.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.02.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.09.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 22.03.2019 | Appeal received No. T0862/19 | 27.05.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.02.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 28.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2008 | AT | 18.05.2016 | BE | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | DK | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | ES | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | HR | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | NL | 18.05.2016 | PL | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | SE | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | TR | 18.05.2016 | NO | 18.08.2016 | GR | 19.08.2016 | IS | 18.09.2016 | PT | 19.09.2016 | GB | 21.01.2017 | IE | 21.01.2017 | LU | 21.01.2017 | MT | 21.01.2017 | FR | 31.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 21.01.2008 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
GB | 21.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.01.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
MT | 21.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.01.2008 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
TR | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
GB | 21.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.01.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
MT | 21.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.01.2008 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
GB | 21.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.01.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
MT | 21.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 21.01.2008 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
GB | 21.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.01.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
MT | 21.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.01.2008 | |
AT | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
GB | 21.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.01.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
MT | 21.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
GB | 21.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.01.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
MT | 21.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
GB | 21.01.2017 | ||
IE | 21.01.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
GB | 21.01.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 18.05.2016 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 18.05.2016 | |
ES | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
GR | 19.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | |
NO | 18.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5344313 (JOHNSEN JR CORTLAND W [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US5865441 (ORLOWSKI DAVID C [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 11; figure 2 *; | [X]US6070880 (MCKEEVER JAMES F [GB]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 16 - line 51; figure 3 * | International search | [Y]JPS4934210B ; | [Y]JPS619674U ; | [Y]JPS63166764U ; | [Y]JPH05106746 (AKATAKE ENG KK); | [A]JP2002156092 (DENGYOSHA MACH WORKS); | [Y]JP2003144892 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) | Examination | US3994503 | Opposition | CH572174 | US3994503 | US5344313 | US5865441 | US6070880 | EP1059475 | EP2110558 | - PAUL MEUTER et al., "THUNDER HORSE INJECTION PUMP", Proceedings of the Twentieth International Pump Users Symposium, Houston, Texas, USA, (20030317), pages 1 - 18, XP055354367 | - Burgmann, "Design Manual 15.4", Burgmann Mechanical Seals, pages 113 - 114, XP055354372 | - Burgmann, "Design Manual 15.3", Burgmann Mechanical Seals, (20041130), pages 109 - 110, XP055354377 | - "EagleBurgmann Seal supply systems", EagleBurgmann, (20150700), pages 32 - 34, XP055354380 | - SULZER PUMPEN, Kreiselpumpen Handbuch, Vulkan-Verlag Essen, (19970000), pages 173 - 176, XP055354394 | - PAUL MEUTER et al., "THUNDER HORSE INJECTION PUMP", Proceedings of the Twentieth International Pump Users Symposium, Houston, Texas, USA, (20030317), pages 1 - 18 | - Burgmann, "Design Manual 15.4", Burgmann Mechanical Seals, pages 113 - 114 | - Burgmann, "Design Manual 15.3", Burgmann Mechanical Seals, (20041130), pages 109 - 110 | - SULZER PUMPEN, Kreiselpumpen Handbuch, Vulkan-Verlag Essen, (19970000), pages 173 - 176 | - Document 'API 610' | - Document 'Plan 53B' |