EP2110354 - BAND-LIKE BODY WINDING REEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sato Holdings Kabushiki Kaisha 7-1, Shimomeguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-0064 / JP | [2016/52] |
Former [2009/43] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Sato 9-10, Ebisu 4-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSHI, Kazuyuki c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA SATO 9-10 Ebisu 4-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP | [2017/10] |
Former [2009/43] | 01 /
HOSHI, Kazuyuki c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA SATO 9-10 Ebisu 4-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/10] |
Former [2009/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08704015.0 | 28.01.2008 | [2009/43] | WO2008JP51206 | Priority number, date | JP20070019380 | 30.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007019380 | [2009/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008093636 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110354 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110354 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/58, B65H75/24 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
B65H75/2484 (EP,US);
B65H54/585 (EP,US);
B65H2701/372 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/18] | B65H18/04, B65H19/30, B65H75/14, B65H75/22, B41J35/28 | ||
Former IPC [2009/43] | B65H18/04, B65H19/30, B65H75/14, B65H75/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2009/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ROLLE FÜR STREIFENFÖRMIGE KÖRPERWICKEL | [2009/43] | English: | BAND-LIKE BODY WINDING REEL | [2009/43] | French: | BOBINE D'ENROULEMENT D'UN CORPS EN FORME DE BANDE | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2009 | Translation filed | 22.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 03.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2008 | AT | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | DK | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | ES | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | IT | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | NL | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | SE | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | NO | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 28.01.2008 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3214107 (ATKIN ERIC D) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, lines 23-25 * * column 2, lines 3-65 * [I] 4; | [XY]JPS579667 (KOYO JIDOKI) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]JPH10137848 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [Y] 3,4* abstract * | International search | [A]JPH02149650U ; | [Y]JPH08128433 (SERU JAPAN KK); | [Y]JPH10137848 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [Y]JP2004299862 (SATO KK) | by applicant | JPH06127064 |