EP2128086 - CARBON MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE CARBON MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chuo Denki Kogyo Co., Ltd. 272 Oaza Taguchi Myoko-shi Niigata 949-2193 / JP | [2010/42] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIWARA, Tooru c/o SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Hiroshi c/o SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Jackson, Martin Peter, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08704158.8 | 30.01.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008JP51391 | Priority number, date | JP20070021627 | 31.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007021627 | [2009/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008093724 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128086 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/587, H01M10/42, C01B32/372, H01M4/36, H01M10/0525 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
H01M10/4235 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/05 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/362 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | C01B31/02, H01M4/58, H01M10/42 | ||
Former IPC [2009/49] | C01B31/04, H01M4/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | KOHLENSTOFFMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES KOHLENSTOFFMATERIALS | [2009/49] | English: | CARBON MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE CARBON MATERIAL | [2009/49] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE CARBONE ET PROCESSUS DE FABRICATION DU MATÉRIAU CARBONE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2009 | Translation filed | 29.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 13.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/29] | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XL]JP2006044969 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [X] 1-4 * examples 3,7; table 1 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0054] - [0000] , [0053] , [0057] - [0059] * [L] 1-4; | [X]EP1681738 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * example 1 * * tables 1,2,3 * * paragraphs [0058] , [0060] *; | [A]WO03064560 (CONOCOPHILLIPS CO [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * pages 21-65 * | International search | [X]JP2006044969 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [X]JP2004210634 (JFE CHEMICAL CORP); | [X]JP2003100292 (OSAKA GAS CHEM KK) | by applicant | JP2003100292 | JPH10321218 | JPH10255851 | JPH0594838 | JPH05217604 | JPH05307976 | JPH05307977 |