EP2120431 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIDA, Kaoru c/o Nec Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 (Fünf Höfe) 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08704247.9 | 31.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008JP51500 | Priority number, date | JP20070028586 | 07.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007028586 | [2009/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008096658 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120431 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/2745, H04M11/00, H04Q7/38 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
H04M1/2757 (EP,US);
H04W12/126 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2009/47] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2009/47] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2009 | Translation filed | 07.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 28.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002165008 (SASHIHARA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0039] , [0070] - [0088] ** figures 6-10 *; | [I]US2003004881 (SHINZAKI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0146] - [0150] - [0154] - [0157] - [0190] - [0192]; figures 1-15 *; | [I]US2006285663 (RATHUS SPENCER A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0036] - [0041] - [0046]; figures 1-7B * | International search | [X]JP2006050420 (TECHNOCORE CO LTD); | [A]JP2006287853 (HITACHI LTD) | by applicant | JP2002057807 | JP2003223368 | JP2003319453 | JP2007028586 |