EP2107891 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DIAGNOSTIC AND TREATMENT USING HARD TISSUE OR MATERIAL MICROPERFORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rejuvedent, LLC Suite 16, 150 Quincy Shore Drive Quincy, MA 02171 / US | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTSHULER, Gregory, B. 17 Cerulean Way Lincoln, MA 01773 / US | 02 /
BELIKOV, Andrey, Vyacheslavovich 141/86 Narodnogo Opolcheniya Avenue St. Petersburg, 198217 / RU | 03 /
FELDCHTEIN, Felix, Isakovich 16 Alder Lane Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 04 /
TUCHIN, Valery, Victorovich 83 Astrakhanskaya Street Saratov, 410012 / RU | 05 /
VYBORNOV, Alexander, Grigorievich 150 Quincy Shore Drive Apartment 16 Quincy, MA 02171 / US | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Werner Franz Reichert & Kollegen Bismarckplatz 8 93047 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Reichert, Werner Franz Reichert & Benninger Bismarckplatz 8 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08705961.4 | 16.01.2008 | [2009/42] | WO2008US51241 | Priority number, date | US20070885009P | 16.01.2007 Original published format: US 885009 P | [2009/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008089292 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2107891 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/00, A61B5/00 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
A61C1/0046 (EP,US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
A61B5/0088 (EP,US);
A61B5/415 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/42] | A61C13/007 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON HARTEM GEWEBE ODER MATERIAL-MIKROPERFORATION | [2009/42] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DIAGNOSTIC AND TREATMENT USING HARD TISSUE OR MATERIAL MICROPERFORATION | [2009/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE TRAITEMENT UTILISANT LA MICROPERFORATION DE TISSU OU DE MATÉRIAU DUR | [2009/42] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/42] | 16.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/33] | 22.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6709269 (ALTSHULER GREGORY B [US]) [X] 10,12 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0047] * * claim 49 * * the whole document * [Y] 13; | [XY]US2006195072 (MILLER R J D [CA]) [X] 10,12 * the whole document * [Y] 13; | [XY]WO2005070151 (BIOLASE TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 10,12 * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 17 * [Y] 13; | [Y]US6315567 (HASEL ROBERT W [US]) [Y] 13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5846080 (SCHNEIDER RICHARD THEODORE [US]); | [Y]US5409376 (MURPHY QUENTIN M [US]); | [Y]US5257935 (VASSILIADIS ARTHUR [US], et al); | [Y]US5275564 (VASSILIADIS ARTHUR [US], et al); | [A]US5456603 (KOWALYK KENNETH [US], et al) |