EP2115367 - RESONATOR ARRANGEMENT FOR THE CABINET OF A REFRIGERATION APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL S.A. Avenida das Nações Unidas 12995 32 andar - Brooklin Novo 04578-000 São Paulo SP / BR | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAARS, Edmar Rua Almirante Tamandaré, 193 - apt.101 89204-140 Joinville/SC / BR | 02 /
SANTINI JÚNIOR, Otávio Rua Guilherme Finkbeiner, 322 Fundos Bairro Costa e Silva 89220-420 Joinville-SC / BR | [2010/07] |
Former [2009/46] | 01 /
BAARS, Edmar Rua Almirante Tamandaré, 193 - apt.101 89204-140 Joinville/SC / BR | ||
02 /
SANTINI JÚNIOR, Otávio Rua Dona Elza Meinert, 531 - apt. 403 - BL.C2 89218-650 Joinville/SC / BR | Representative(s) | Geyer, Werner Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Geyer, Werner Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08706165.1 | 29.01.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008BR00030 | Priority number, date | BR2007PI00554 | 30.01.2007 Original published format: BR PI0700554 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008092223 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2115367 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F25D21/14 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
F25D21/14 (EP,KR,US);
F25D19/00 (KR);
F25D23/00 (KR);
F25B2500/12 (EP,US);
F25D2201/30 (EP,US);
F25D2321/1411 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | RESONATORANORDNUNG FÜR DAS GEHÄUSE EINER KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2009/46] | English: | RESONATOR ARRANGEMENT FOR THE CABINET OF A REFRIGERATION APPLIANCE | [2009/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF RÉSONATEUR POUR L'ARMOIRE D'UN APPAREIL DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 01.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4243320 (ILLBRUCK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2,34,41 * the whole document *; | [IY]JPH0933159 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [I] 1 * (see http://dossier1.ipdl.inpit.go.jp/AIPN/aipn_call_transl.ipdl?N0000=7413&N0120=01&N2001=2&N3001=H09-033159) * * abstract * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,34,41; | [A]US5699677 (HAKALA KEVIN E [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9920825 (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * page 14, line 29 - page 17, line 13 * * figures 7-10 *; | [A]US6393854 (SCHEUER ILARIO JOSE [BR], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]JP2003172575 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-47 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US6595013 (SIMEONE ROBERT S [US]) [A] 1-47 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6708518 (JONES EANGLA TAYLOR [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,4,5 * |