EP2114354 - LIGHT PROTECTIVE PREPARATION WITH A COMBINATION OF MICROPIGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastraße 48 20253 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Blatt, Thomas Julius-Leber-Weg 6 22880 Wedel / DE | For all designated states Wolber, Rainer Fieberkleestieg 4 22397 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Smuda, Christoph Crivitzstieg 2a 25474 Bönningstedt / DE | For all designated states Clausen, Andreas Papendamm 28 20146 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Mundt, Claudia Nordstrasse 318 8037 Zürich / CH | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLATT, Thomas Steinberg 15 22880 Wedel / DE | 02 /
WOLBER, Rainer Fieberkleestieg 4 22397 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
SMUDA, Christoph Crivitzstieg 2a 25474 Bönningstedt / DE | 04 /
CLAUSEN, Andreas Hasweg 33 25436 Tornesch / DE | 05 /
MUNDT, Claudia Nordstrasse 318 CH-8037 Zürich / CH | 06 /
REINECKE, Myriam Grelckstrasse 34 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2009/48] |
Former [2009/46] | 01 /
BLATT, Thomas Julius-Leber-Weg 6 22880 Wedel / DE | ||
02 /
WOLBER, Rainer Fieberkleestieg 4 22397 Hamburg / DE | |||
03 /
SMUDA, Christoph Crivitzstieg 2a 25474 Bönningstedt / DE | |||
04 /
CLAUSEN, Andreas Papendamm 28 20146 Hamburg / DE | |||
05 /
MUNDT, Claudia Nordstrasse 318 CH-8037 Zürich / CH | |||
06 /
REINECKE, Myriam Grelckstrasse 8a 22529 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08707435.7 | 31.01.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008EP00746 | Priority number, date | DE20071005335 | 01.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007005335 | [2009/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008092673 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2114354 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2114354 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q17/04, A61K8/49, A61K8/02, A61K8/29, A61K8/27, A61K8/19 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP);
A61K8/0241 (EP);
A61K8/19 (EP);
A61K8/27 (EP);
A61K8/29 (EP);
A61K8/494 (EP);
A61K2800/412 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | A61K8/02, A61K8/19, A61K8/27, A61K8/29, A61K8/49, A61Q17/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/25] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LICHTSCHUTZZUBEREITUNG MIT EINER KOMBINATION VON MIKROPIGMENTEN | [2009/46] | English: | LIGHT PROTECTIVE PREPARATION WITH A COMBINATION OF MICROPIGMENTS | [2009/46] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA LUMIÈRE COMPRENANT UNE COMBINAISON DE MICROPIGMENTS | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2008 | CY | 20.06.2018 | CZ | 20.06.2018 | DK | 20.06.2018 | EE | 20.06.2018 | ES | 20.06.2018 | FI | 20.06.2018 | HR | 20.06.2018 | IT | 20.06.2018 | LT | 20.06.2018 | LV | 20.06.2018 | MC | 20.06.2018 | MT | 20.06.2018 | NL | 20.06.2018 | PL | 20.06.2018 | RO | 20.06.2018 | SE | 20.06.2018 | SI | 20.06.2018 | SK | 20.06.2018 | TR | 20.06.2018 | BG | 20.09.2018 | NO | 20.09.2018 | GR | 21.09.2018 | IS | 20.10.2018 | PT | 22.10.2018 | AT | 31.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | GB | 31.01.2019 | IE | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | LU | 31.01.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
MT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
AT | 31.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
GB | 31.01.2019 | ||
IE | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
LU | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
MT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
AT | 31.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
GB | 31.01.2019 | ||
IE | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
LU | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
AT | 31.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
GB | 31.01.2019 | ||
IE | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
LU | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
GB | 31.01.2019 | ||
IE | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
LU | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
GB | 31.01.2019 | ||
IE | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
LU | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
GB | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
LU | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
GB | 31.01.2019 | ||
LU | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
LU | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 20.06.2018 | |
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006018846 (HAASE JURG [CH] ET AL) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 15 * * page 3, paragraph 70 - paragraph 73 * * page 9; figure HPB17 * * examples 24-32 *; | [Y]GB2412866 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 12 * * page 7, line 1 - line 9; table 1 *; | [PX]GB2433439 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102005010803 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - POPOV ALEXEY P ET AL, Effect of size of TiO2 nanoparticles embedded into stratum corneum on ultraviolet-A and ultraviolet-B sun-blocking properties of the skin, JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, PAGE(S) 64037/1 - 64037/9, (20051208), ISSN 1083-3668, XP002435985 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.2138017 | Examination | WO2007071584 |