EP2114372 - PHARMACEUTICAL CARRIER COMPOSITION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dafra Pharma N.V. Slachthuisstraat 30/7 2300 Turnhout / BE | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSEN, Frans, Herwig Witte Bremlaan 30 B-2360 Oud-Turnhout / BE | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | van Kooij, Adriaan, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | van Kooij, Adriaan, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/46] | van Kooij, Adriaan, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelickplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08707701.2 | 13.02.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008EP01093 | Priority number, date | WO2007EP01234 | 13.02.2007 Original published format: PCT/EP2007/001234 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008098750 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2114372 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2114372 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K47/26, A61K47/38, A61K31/135, A61K31/335 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/335 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE TRÄGERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2009/46] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL CARRIER COMPOSITION AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [2009/46] | French: | COMPOSITION D'EXCIPIENT PHARMACEUTIQUE ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2013 | 20.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2008 | BG | 21.05.2014 | CY | 21.05.2014 | CZ | 21.05.2014 | DK | 21.05.2014 | EE | 21.05.2014 | ES | 21.05.2014 | FI | 21.05.2014 | HR | 21.05.2014 | IT | 21.05.2014 | LT | 21.05.2014 | LV | 21.05.2014 | MC | 21.05.2014 | MT | 21.05.2014 | PL | 21.05.2014 | RO | 21.05.2014 | SE | 21.05.2014 | SI | 21.05.2014 | SK | 21.05.2014 | NO | 21.08.2014 | GR | 22.08.2014 | IS | 21.09.2014 | PT | 22.09.2014 | AT | 13.02.2015 | IE | 13.02.2015 | LU | 13.02.2015 | TR | 13.02.2015 | [2024/42] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 13.02.2008 | |
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
AT | 13.02.2015 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
AT | 13.02.2015 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
AT | 13.02.2015 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BE | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
AT | 13.02.2015 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | BE | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | BE | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | BE | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | BE | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | BE | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | BE | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | BE | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | BE | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | ES | 21.05.2014 | |
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 21.05.2014 | |
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 21.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9202217 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [X]US6214386 (SANTUS GIANCARLO [IT], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 12; example 8 *; | [X]WO02069939 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * page 17; example 6 *; | [X]US6515008 (TIONGSON ANTONIO S [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 5; example 1 *; | [A]WO2004075817 (UNIV BRUXELLES [BE], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1652524 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [X] 1-19 * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 9; example 10 *; | [X]US2006198895 (KOTLIAR ELEONORA M [IL], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 1, paragraph 5 - paragraph 7 * * page 2, paragraph 22 * * page 3 - page 4; example 1 * | Examination | - M. GABRIELS; J. PLAIZIER-VERCAMMEN, "Experimental designed optimization and stability evaluation of dry suspensions with artemisinin derivatives for paediatric use", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, (20040823), vol. 283, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ijpharm.2004.05.033, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 19 - 34, XP004560628 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2004.05.033 |