EP2245823 - FACILITATING SUBSCRIPTION SERVICES IN THE IMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLM, Tomas Vitsippstigen 6A S-125 54 ÄlvsjÖ / SE | 02 /
MULLIGAN, Catherine Hantverkargatan 85 S-112 38 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
NORDIN, Hans Nibblebacken 72 S-146 52 Tullinge / SE | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | ||
Former [2010/44] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08708460.4 | 30.01.2008 | [2010/44] | WO2008EP51145 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009095075 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245823 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2245823 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/12, H04L29/08 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
H04L65/1063 (EP,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L67/1029 (EP,US);
H04L67/1031 (EP,US);
H04L67/53 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L61/4588 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/44] | H04L29/06, H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | SUBSKRIPTIONSDIENSTE IM IMS | [2010/44] | English: | FACILITATING SUBSCRIPTION SERVICES IN THE IMS | [2010/44] | French: | FACILITATION DES SERVICES D'ABONNEMENT DANS LE RÉSEAU IMS | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2008 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | HR | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | NO | 07.08.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | IE | 30.01.2015 | LU | 30.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | FR | 02.02.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); IP Multimedia Subsystem (IMS) Sh interface; Signalling flows and message contents (3GPP TS 29.328 version 7.8.0 Release 7); ETSI TS 129 328", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20080101), vol. 3-CN4, no. V7.8.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014040687 [Y] 1-11 * page 12 - page 20 * * page 30 - page 31 * | [Y] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Open Service Access (OSA); Stage 2 (3GPP TS 23.198 version 7.3.0 Release 7); ETSI TS 123 198", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20080101), vol. 3-CT5, no. V7.3.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014040560 [Y] 1-11 * page 8 - page 11 * * page 13 - page 14 * * page 18 - page 20 * |