EP2115145 - A RECOMBINANT HOST CELL FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A COMPOUND OF INTEREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2009/46] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAGT, Cornelis, Maria, Jacobus Karl Millockerhof 19 NL-3543 HV Utrecht / NL | 02 /
VAN PEIJ, Noël, Nicolaas, Maria, Elisabeth Poldermeesterstraat 7 NL-2645 KJ Delfgauw / NL | 03 /
WÖSTEN, Herman Abel Bernard C. Huygenslaan 19 NL-3705 SN Zeist / NL | 04 /
COSTA RODRIGUES ALVES, Alexandra Maria Hemsterhuislaan 30 NL-9752 NE Haren / NL | 05 /
DE VRIES, Ronald, Peter Seychellen 142 NL-3524 JB Utrecht / NL | 06 /
LEVIN CHUCREL, Ana Marcela c/El Greco No 4, Valencia E-46183 La Eliana / ES | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Monaco, Vania, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | van Grieken-Plooster, Izabella Johanna, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 130 6100 AC Echt / NL | ||
Former [2009/46] | van Grieken-Plooster, Izabella Johanna, et al DSM Intellectual Property Delft Office 600-0240 P.O. Box 1 2600 MA Delft / NL | Application number, filing date | 08708913.2 | 12.02.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008EP51680 | Priority number, date | EP20070102493 | 15.02.2007 Original published format: EP 07102493 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008098933 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2115145 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/67, C12N15/80, C12N1/14, C12P1/02, C12P21/00 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
C12N15/80 (EP,US);
C12N9/0061 (EP,US);
C12N9/2428 (EP,US);
C12Y110/03002 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTE WIRTSZELLE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER INTERESSIERENDEN VERBINDUNG | [2009/46] | English: | A RECOMBINANT HOST CELL FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A COMPOUND OF INTEREST | [2009/46] | French: | CELLULE HÔTE RECOMBINANTE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ D'INTÉRÊT | [2009/46] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/39] | 18.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/39] | Divisional application(s) | EP13155896.7 / EP2631295 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9943835 (NOVO NORDISK BIOTECH INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 7, paragraph 2 * * claims 1,3,4,17 * | [X] - YOSHIMURA I ET AL, "Suicide gene therapy on LNCaP human prostate cancer cells.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF UROLOGY : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE JAPANESE UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION JUL 2001, (200107), vol. 8, no. 7, ISSN 0919-8172, pages S5 - S8, XP002439403 [X] 1,2,4-16 * abstract * * page S6, column L, paragraph 3 * * page S6, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1442-2042.2001.00327.x | Examination | WO2005040388 | EP0238023 | WO9635796 | - HERMAN J PEL ET AL, "Genome sequencing and analysis of the versatile cell factory Aspergillus niger CBS 513.88", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20070201), vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1038/nbt1282, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 221 - 231, XP055030140 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1282 |