EP2132476 - METHOD FOR FILLING A PRESSURISED RESERVOIR PROVIDED FOR A CRYOGENIC STORED MEDIUM IN PARTICULAR HYDROGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNNER, Tobias Oskar von Millerstasse 25 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2009/51] | Application number, filing date | 08709217.7 | 26.02.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008EP52314 | Priority number, date | DE20071011530 | 09.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007011530 | [2009/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008110453 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2132476 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F17C5/00, F17C5/06, F17C5/04, F17C5/02, F17C9/02 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
F17C5/007 (EP,US);
F17C5/02 (EP,US);
F17C5/04 (EP,US);
F17C5/06 (EP,US);
F17C9/02 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0364 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0367 (EP,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US);
F17C2225/0115 (EP,US);
F17C2225/036 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0135 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0339 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0374 (EP,US);
F17C2260/031 (EP,US);
F17C2265/031 (EP,US);
F17C2265/032 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEFÜLLEN EINES FÜR EIN KRYOGENES SPEICHERMEDIUM, INSBESONDERE WASSERSTOFF, VORGESEHENEN DRUCKSPEICHERS | [2009/51] | English: | METHOD FOR FILLING A PRESSURISED RESERVOIR PROVIDED FOR A CRYOGENIC STORED MEDIUM IN PARTICULAR HYDROGEN | [2009/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REMPLISSAGE D'UN RÉSERVOIR SOUS PRESSION PRÉVU POUR UN FLUIDE À STOCKER CRYOGÉNIQUE, NOTAMMENT DE L'HYDROGÈNE | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 10.02.2011 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 18.02.2011 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1683999 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004081441 (CONVERSION GAS IMP S L P [US], et al); | [DA]DE4129020 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]); | [A]CA2362844 (WESTPORT RES INC [CA]) |