EP2238050 - LABYRINTH CAPSULE FOR DRINK POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2010/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANGERLE, Wolfgang Stetterstrasse 20 CH-5507 Mellingen / CH | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Felber, Josef Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 08709807.5 | 06.02.2008 | [2010/41] | WO2008IB00321 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008087553 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2238050 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2238050 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/804 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
B65D85/8055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] | Title | German: | LABYRINTH-KAPSEL FÜR GETRÄNKEPULVER | [2010/41] | English: | LABYRINTH CAPSULE FOR DRINK POWDER | [2010/41] | French: | CAPSULE À LABYRINTHE POUR BOISSON EN POUDRE | [2010/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 15.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2008 | CY | 20.04.2011 | CZ | 20.04.2011 | DK | 20.04.2011 | EE | 20.04.2011 | FI | 20.04.2011 | HR | 20.04.2011 | IE | 20.04.2011 | LT | 20.04.2011 | LV | 20.04.2011 | MT | 20.04.2011 | PL | 20.04.2011 | RO | 20.04.2011 | SI | 20.04.2011 | SK | 20.04.2011 | TR | 20.04.2011 | BG | 20.07.2011 | NO | 20.07.2011 | GR | 21.07.2011 | ES | 31.07.2011 | IS | 20.08.2011 | PT | 22.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
TR | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 20.04.2011 | |
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1429932 (GRUEN ERNST) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraph 2; figure . *; | [A]WO03059778 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP1500358 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO2006021405 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1* figure - * | by applicant | WO03059778 |