EP2121562 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING DIMETHYL CARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIC FERNANDEZ, Ignacio Player del Saler, 2, Las Matas E-28290 Madrid / ES | 02 /
FILLION, Benoit C/Azarbe del Papel E-30007 Murcia / ES | 03 /
MURTHY, Vutukuru Flat No. -206, Golden Nest Apartments 29, Adugodi Main Road Bangalore 560030 / IN | 04 /
NAIR, Vinod Flat no. 302, Sree Balaji Residency 157/1, 4th Main, 1st Cross BEML layout Bangalore / IN | 05 /
PEREZ COLLADO, Mario Avenida Venecia 17, 3oA Poligono de Santa Ana E-30319 Murcia / ES | [2017/25] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
VIC FERNANDEZ, Ignacio Player del Saler, 2, Las Matas E-28290 Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
FILLION, Benoit C/Azarbe del Papel E-30007 Murcia / ES | |||
03 /
MURTHY, Vutukuru Flat No. -206, Golden Nest Apartments 29, Adugodi Main Road Bangalore 560030 / IN | |||
04 /
NAIR, Vinod Flat no. 302, Sree Balaji Residency 157/1, 4th Main, 1st Cross BEML layout Bangalore / IN | |||
05 /
PEREZ COLLADO, Mario Avenida Venecia 17, 3oA Poligono de Santa Ana E-30319 Murcia / ES | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2017/25] |
Former [2009/48] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08710066.5 | 15.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008IB50570 | Priority number, date | US20070890288P | 16.02.2007 Original published format: US 890288 P | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008099369 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2121562 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121562 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C68/00, C07C69/96 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
C07C68/01 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C68/01, C07C69/96 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | C07C68/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIMETHYLCARBONAT | [2009/48] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING DIMETHYL CARBONATE | [2009/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CARBONATE DE DIMÉTHYLE | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2015/33] | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2008 | AT | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | HR | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | NL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | TR | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | NO | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | GB | 15.02.2018 | IE | 15.02.2018 | LU | 15.02.2018 | MT | 15.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | FR | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 15.02.2008 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
MT | 15.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
TR | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
MT | 15.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
MT | 15.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
GB | 15.02.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
IE | 15.02.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 15.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
HR | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
NO | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US5536864 (PARET GIANCARLO [IT], et al) [I] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * column 1, lines 11-23 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 1' * * figure 1A * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]EP1156028 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0009] - [0014] , [0024] *; | [Y] - JOHN C MIDDLETON ET AL, "Ullmann's Encyclopedia, Stirred-Tank and Loop Reactors", ULLMANN'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF INDUSTRIAL CHEMISTRY, XX, XX, (20050615), pages 1 - 14, XP002449394 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5536864 (PARET GIANCARLO [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * column 1, line 11 - line 23 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 10; figure 1A *; | [A]EP1156028 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0009] - [0014] * | Examination | - JOHN C MIDDLETON ET AL, "Ullmann's Encyclopedia, Stirred-Tank and Loop Reactors", ULLMANN'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF INDUSTRIAL CHEMISTRY, XX, XX, (20050615), pages 1 - 14, XP002449394 |