EP2116997 - AUDIO DECODING DEVICE AND AUDIO DECODING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHARA, Hiroyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation, I.P.R.O.C. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-Ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08710509.4 | 29.02.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008JP00406 | Priority number, date | JP20070053531 | 02.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007053531 | [2009/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008108082 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2116997 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/14 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
G10L19/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | AUDIODECODIERUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND AUDIODECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2009/46] | English: | AUDIO DECODING DEVICE AND AUDIO DECODING METHOD | [2009/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE AUDIO ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE AUDIO | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2009 | Translation filed | 31.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 22.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/47] | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2005041170 (NOKIA CORPRATION [FI], et al) [X] 1,3 * page 9, line 33 - page 17, line 21 * [A] 2 | [XA] - GRANCHAROV V ET AL, "Noise-dependent postfiltering", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP ' 04). IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MONTREAL, QUEBEC, CANADA 17-21 MAY 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040517), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2004.1326021, ISBN 978-0-7803-8484-2, pages 457 - 460, XP010717664 [X] 1,3 * page 457, column l, line 1 - page 459, column r, line 12; figure 1; tables 1,2 * [A] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2004.1326021 | International search | [Y]JPH10171497 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 2 * , Par. Nos. [0016], [0017], [0031] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004302258 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH09281995 (NEC CORP) [A] 1, 3 * , Par. No. [0188] & US 5857168 A & EP 801377 A2 & DE 69708191 T & CA 2201217 A & CA 2201217 A1 *; | [EA]WO2008032828 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [EA] 1-3 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) * | [YA] - VOLODYA GRANCHAROV et al., "NOISE-DEPENDENT POSTFILTERING", Processing of IEEE International Conference on Acoustics, Speech, and Signal, (20040000), vol. 1, pages I-457 - 1-460, XP010717664 [Y] 1, 3 [A] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2004.1326021 | [A] - RAINER MARTIN, "Noise Power Spectral Density Estimation Based on Optimal Smoothing and Minimum Statistics", IEEE Transactions on Speech and Audio Processing, (20010700), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 504 - 512, XP002385167 [A] 1, 3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/89.928915 | by applicant | US6385573 | JP2007053531 | - CHEN J-H, GERSHO A, "Adaptive postfiltering for quality enhancement of coded speech", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING., IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY., US, US, (19950101), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.1109/89.365380, ISSN 1063-6676, pages 59 - 71, XP002235479 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/89.365380 |