EP2108793 - BREAKDOWN DIAGNOSING DEVICE FOR EXHAUST CLEANING SYSTEM, AND BREAKDOWN DIAGNOSING METHOD FOR EXHAUST CLEANING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Corporation 6-7, Shibuya 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8360 / JP | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAZAWA, Eiichi c/o Bosch Corporation 3-13-26 Yakyu-cho Higashimatsuyama-shi Saitama 355-8603 / JP | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Knapp, Thomas Dreiss Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Knapp, Thomas Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08710590.4 | 25.01.2008 | [2009/42] | WO2008JP51089 | Priority number, date | JP20070024214 | 02.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007024214 | [2009/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008093616 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2108793 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2108793 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, B01D53/94, F01N3/08, F01N3/28 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
F01N11/002 (EP,US);
F01N11/00 (KR);
B01D53/9495 (EP,US);
F01N11/007 (EP,US);
F01N3/206 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N3/208 (EP,US);
F01N3/28 (KR);
F01N9/00 (KR);
B01D2257/404 (EP,US);
B01D2258/012 (EP,US);
F01N2550/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/14 (EP,US);
F01N2900/0411 (EP,US);
F01N2900/0418 (EP,US);
F01N2900/14 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1621 (EP,US);
Y02C20/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Title | German: | VERSAGENSDIAGNOSEVORRICHTUNG FÜR ABGASREINIGUNGSSYSTEM UND VERSAGENSDIAGNOSEVERFAHREN FÜR ABGASREINIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2009/42] | English: | BREAKDOWN DIAGNOSING DEVICE FOR EXHAUST CLEANING SYSTEM, AND BREAKDOWN DIAGNOSING METHOD FOR EXHAUST CLEANING SYSTEM | [2009/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC DE PANNE POUR UN SYSTÈME D'ÉPURATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT, ET PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC DE PANNE POUR UN TEL SYSTÈME D'ÉPURATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2009/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2009 | Translation filed | 02.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/42] | 24.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2010 | BE | 07.07.2010 | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | HR | 07.07.2010 | HU | 07.07.2010 | IT | 07.07.2010 | LT | 07.07.2010 | LV | 07.07.2010 | MT | 07.07.2010 | NL | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | PT | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | NO | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | IS | 07.11.2010 | IE | 25.01.2011 | LU | 25.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PT | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
TR | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
LU | 25.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PT | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
LU | 25.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
LU | 25.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
MT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
HR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
NO | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07180535 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US5851376 (NISHIOKA FUTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 6, line 26 - line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0915244 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7* column 16, line 38 - line 56; figure 1 *; | [A]US6092368 (ISHII TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 6 * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 39; figures 1,13 * | International search | [Y]JPH07180535 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JPH09203313 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [Y]JPH09236569 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2004092607 (MAZDA MOTOR) | by applicant | JPH0754641 | JP2005054604 |