EP2136544 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Nobuyuki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08710622.5 | 29.01.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008JP51295 | Priority number, date | JP20070059246 | 08.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007059246 | [2009/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008108121 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2136544 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
H04N1/32101 (EP);
H04N1/4413 (EP);
H04N1/4433 (EP);
H04N1/444 (EP);
H04L51/212 (EP);
H04N1/44 (EP);
H04N2201/0093 (EP);
H04N2201/3205 (EP);
H04N2201/3212 (EP);
H04N2201/3225 (EP);
H04N2201/3246 (EP);
H04N2201/3271 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/52] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2009/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2009 | Translation filed | 01.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 13.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003217282 (HENRY STEVEN G [US]) [X] 1-7,15,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0043] * [Y] 8-14; | [Y]US2005265744 (URUTA HIROYA [JP]) [Y] 8-14* abstract * | International search | [A]JP2000156773 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2005184716 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD); | [A]JP2005217879 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2006191284 (RICOH KK) | by applicant | JPH1084437 | JP2005217879 | JP2006259843 |