EP2112532 - ELECTROWETTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2009/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRITA, Shina c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
KAWASHIMA, Toshitaka c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2009/44] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08710753.8 | 04.02.2008 | [2009/44] | WO2008JP51774 | Priority number, date | JP20070031442 | 13.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007031442 | [2009/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008099702 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2112532 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/06, G02B3/14, G02B26/02 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
G02B26/005 (EP,US);
G02B3/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/44] | G02B1/06, G02B3/14, G02B26/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | ELEKTROBENETZUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/44] | English: | ELECTROWETTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2009/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉLECTROMOUILLAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2009/44] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2009 | Translation filed | 10.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 12.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/46] | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102005025722 (LANDESSTIFTUNG BADEN WUERTTEMB [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0040]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2004196525 (FUJII TAKAMICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0090]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0175] *; | [Y]US2006254933 (ADACHI SAKUICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0080] *; | [Y]US2005104102 (FUKUZUMI YOSHIAKI [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2003302502 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH11330391 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP); | [Y]JPS61198592 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [Y]JPH05114482 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2006194598 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11185969 (DENSO CORP); | [Y]JP2005109702 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2005244184 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2007017668 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC); | [Y]JP2005150457 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2000347005 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2001519539 | by applicant | JP2007031442 | WO9918456 | JP2003302502 |