EP2119620 - RUBBER CRAWLER TRACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGIO, Daisuke c/o Bridgestone Corporation 10-1 Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2011/51] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
HAGIO, Daisuke c/o Bridgestone Corporation 10-1 Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2011/51] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/47] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08710789.2 | 05.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008JP51857 | Priority number, date | JP20070025678 | 05.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007025678 | [2009/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008096749 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119620 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2119620 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/24 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
B62D55/244 (EP,US);
B62D55/24 (US)
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | B62D55/253 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | GUMMIRAUPENKETTE | [2009/47] | English: | RUBBER CRAWLER TRACK | [2009/47] | French: | CHENILLE EN CAOUTCHOUC | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2009 | Translation filed | 05.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 07.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2008 | AT | 21.12.2011 | BE | 21.12.2011 | CY | 21.12.2011 | CZ | 21.12.2011 | DK | 21.12.2011 | EE | 21.12.2011 | FI | 21.12.2011 | HR | 21.12.2011 | LT | 21.12.2011 | LV | 21.12.2011 | MT | 21.12.2011 | NL | 21.12.2011 | PL | 21.12.2011 | RO | 21.12.2011 | SE | 21.12.2011 | SI | 21.12.2011 | SK | 21.12.2011 | TR | 21.12.2011 | IE | 05.02.2012 | LU | 05.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | BG | 21.03.2012 | NO | 21.03.2012 | GR | 22.03.2012 | ES | 01.04.2012 | IS | 21.04.2012 | PT | 23.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.02.2012 | ||
LU | 05.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 21.12.2011 | |
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
NO | 21.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS5297740U ; | [X]JPS52119634U ; | [Y]JPS5799476 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD); | [A]JPH03227783 (FUKUYAMA RUBBER IND); | [A]JPH05170148 (OHTSU TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JPH08169211 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) | by applicant | JP3745007B |