EP2113668 - TUBE PUMP, AND PUMP ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JMS Co., Ltd. 12-17, Kakomachi,Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 730-0812 / JP | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOJIMA, Seiji c/o Japan Servo Co. Ltd. Kiryukojo 3-93 Aioi-cho Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-0011 / JP | 02 /
SEKIYA, Kou c/o Japan Servo Co. Ltd. Kiryukojo 3-93 Aioi-cho Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-0011 / JP | 03 /
FUJII, Junya c/o Jms Co., Ltd. Cyuokenkyujo 12-17 Kakomachi Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 730-0812 / JP | 04 /
KAMITO, Shogo c/o Jms Co., Ltd. Cyuokenkyujo 12-17 Kakomachi Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 730-0812 / JP | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K., et al Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Patentanwälte Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K., et al Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Intellectual Property Counselors Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/45] | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K. Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll., Steinsdorfstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08711469.0 | 18.02.2008 | [2009/45] | WO2008JP52645 | Priority number, date | JP20070039442 | 20.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007039442 | [2009/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008102723 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113668 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10, F04B43/12 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
F04B43/1253 (EP,US);
F04B43/1276 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/45] | F04C5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Title | German: | SCHLAUCHPUMPE UND PUMPENROTOR | [2009/45] | English: | TUBE PUMP, AND PUMP ROTOR | [2009/45] | French: | POMPE À TUYAUX ET ROTOR DE POMPE | [2009/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2009 | Translation filed | 18.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 16.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 01.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2549909 (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * figure 8 * * page 14, line 29 - page 15, line 11 *; | [XA]US3963023 (HANKINSON GEORGE R) [X] 1,4 * figure 2 * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 12 * [A] 2,3,5,6; | [A]GB2051253 (WATSON MARLOW LTD) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 30 - line 61 * * page 3, line 26 - line 46 * * figures 2a-2c *; | [A]US4363609 (COSENTINO LOUIS C, et al) [A] 1-6 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 9 *; | [A]US2804023 (LEE JOHN C) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,3,4 * * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 5 *; | [A]DE3940730 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 8 - line 52 * | International search | [A]JPS5252704U ; | [A]JPS5974387 (ASAHI KOGYO CO LTD); | [A]JPS6275786 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US5110270 (MORRICK JOSEPH Q [US]); | [A]GB193574 (CLIFFORD CHARLES CHAMPENEY) | by applicant | JPH06218042 | FR2549909 |