EP2109823 - METHOD OF WRITING DATA INTO SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY AND MEMORY CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKADA, Tomoji c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08711601.8 | 13.02.2008 | [2009/43] | WO2008JP52790 | Priority number, date | JP20070033871 | 14.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007033871 | [2009/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008099958 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2109823 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/10, G11C16/10 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
G11C11/5628 (EP,US);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F12/16 (KR);
G11C16/02 (KR);
G11C16/04 (KR);
G11C16/0483 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/43] | G06F12/16, G11C16/02, G11C16/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHREIBEN VON DATEN IN EINEN HALBLEITERSPEICHER UNG SPEICHERSTEUERUNG | [2009/43] | English: | METHOD OF WRITING DATA INTO SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY AND MEMORY CONTROLLER | [2009/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCRITURE DE DONNÉES DANS UNE MÉMOIRE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET CONTRÔLEUR DE MÉMOIRE | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 18.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003223582 (DAGAN AMIT [IL]) [Y] 5,10,17* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figures 6,7 *; | [Y]US2005105373 (TAKASE YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,8,14 * paragraph [0189]; figures 30a,30b *; | [XY]US2006181934 (SHAPPIR ASSAF [IL], et al) [X] 1-2,4,6-7,9,11-13,15-16,18 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029]; figure 5 * [Y] 3,5,8,10,14,17 | International search | [Y]US2006120162 (FUJIU MASAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2006181934 (SHAPPIR ASSAF [IL], et al) | Examination | JP2005056573 |