EP2133105 - MEDICAL SUBSTITUTE MEMBRANE, USE THEREOF, AND METHOD FOR REPAIR OF MEMBRANE TISSUE IN LIVING BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation University Of Toyama 3190 Gofuku Toyama-shi, Toyama 930-8555 / JP | [2009/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIKAIDO, Toshio c/o Sugitani Campus University of Toyama 2630 Sugitani Toyama-shi Toyama 930-0194 / JP | 02 /
OKABE, Motonori c/o Sugitani Campus University of Toyama 2630 Sugitani Toyama-shi Toyama 930-0194 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Toshiko c/o Sugitani Campus University of Toyama 2630 Sugitani Toyama-shi Toyama 930-0194 / JP | 04 /
ENDO, Shunro c/o Sugitani Campus University of Toyama 2630 Sugitani Toyama-shi Toyama 930-0194 / JP | 05 /
HAYASHI, Nakamasa c/o Sugitani Campus University of Toyama 2630 Sugitani Toyama-shi Toyama 930-0194 / JP | 06 /
SAITO, Shigeru c/o Sugitani Campus University of Toyama 2630 Sugitani Toyama-shi Toyama 930-0194 / JP | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Stuart, Ian Alexander Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08711756.0 | 21.02.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008JP52973 | Priority number, date | JP20070043814 | 23.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007043814 | [2009/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008102847 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2133105 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
A61L27/3604 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/51] | A61L27/00, C12N5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE ERSATZMEMBRAN, IHRE VERWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR VON MEMBRANGEWEBE IN EINEM LEBENDEN KÖRPER | [2009/51] | English: | MEDICAL SUBSTITUTE MEMBRANE, USE THEREOF, AND METHOD FOR REPAIR OF MEMBRANE TISSUE IN LIVING BODY | [2009/51] | French: | MEMBRANE MÉDICALE DE REMPLACEMENT, UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA RÉPARATION D'UN TISSU DE MEMBRANE DANS UN CORPS VIVANT | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2009 | Translation filed | 14.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 16.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]JPH10113384 (SHIMIZU YOSHIHIKO) [ID] 1,2* abstract *; | [X]WO2006129673 (ARBLAST CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * claim 13 *; | [XP]WO2007023750 (UNIV TOYAMA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al) [XP] 1,2 * figure 4; claim 7 *; | [X] - VON VERSEN-HÖYNCK FRAUKE ET AL, "The influence of different preservation and sterilisation steps on the histological properties of amnion allografts--light and scanning electron microscopic studies", CELL AND TISSUE BANKING, SPRINGER, NL, (20040101), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1023/B:CATB.0000022276.47180.96, ISSN 1389-9333, pages 45 - 56, XP002544072 [X] 1,2 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:CATB.0000022276.47180.96 | International search | [X]WO2006129673 (ARBLAST CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XP]WO2007023750 (UNIV TOYAMA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS63260549 | JPH08266613 | JPH10113384 |