EP2254497 - LASER CATHETER FOR BYPASS SURGERY AND ASSEMBLY COMPRISING SAID CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corvasco Medical B.V. 44, Yalelaan 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | [2015/03] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states AMJ B.V. Yalelaan 44 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TULLEKEN, Cornelis Antonius Franciscus Pelmolenweg 76 NL-3511 XP Utrecht / NL | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2014/44] |
Former [2010/48] | Groeneveld, Yme Geert Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 08712627.2 | 21.02.2008 | [2010/48] | WO2008NL50101 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009104949 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2254497 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/24 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
A61B18/24 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1135 (EP,US);
A61B2018/2211 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | LASERKATHETER FÜR EINE BYPASS-OPERATION UND DIESEN KATHETER UMFASSENDE ANORDNUNG | [2010/48] | English: | LASER CATHETER FOR BYPASS SURGERY AND ASSEMBLY COMPRISING SAID CATHETER | [2010/48] | French: | CATHÉTER À LASER POUR CHIRURGIE DES PONTAGES ET ENSEMBLE COMPRENANT LEDIT CATHÉTER | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 08.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 23.07.2014 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2014/44] | 01.12.2014 | Resumption of proceedings | [2014/44] | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP0750476 (MEDOLAS GES FUER MEDIZINTECHNI [DE]) [YD] 1-12 * paragraphs [0020] , [0028] , [0029]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5725544 (RYGAARD JORGEN A [DK]) [Y] 1-12 * column 3, line 8 - line 31; figure 4 *; | [A]DE10107687 (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0045]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0411496 (ECLIPSE SURGICAL TECH [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US6395016 (ORON URI [IL], et al) [A] 1 * column 23, line 20 - line 34; figure 6 *; | [A] - TULLEKEN C A F ET AL, "END-TO-SIDE ANASTOMOSIS OF SMALL VESSELS USING AN ND:YAG LASER WITHA HEMISPHERICAL CONTACT PROBE", JOURNAL OF NEUROSURGERY, XX, XX, (19920301), vol. 76, ISSN 0022-3085, pages 546 - 549, XP000537078 [A] 1 * page 546 - page 547; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0750476 |