EP2118610 - HEAT EXCHANGER OF CROSSFLOW TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airec Ab Hanögatan 5 211 24 Malmö / SE | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Sven Apoteksgatan 12 S-SE-216 14 Limhamn / SE | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 17067 200 10 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Valea AB Anna Lindhs Plats 4 211 19 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Kary, Pierre Zacco Sweden AB Patent Department P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08712861.7 | 03.03.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008SE50234 | Priority number, date | SE20070000570 | 07.03.2007 Original published format: SE 0700570 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008108724 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2118610 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/04, F28D9/00 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
F28D1/0341 (EP,US);
F28D9/0043 (EP,SE,US);
F28D9/00 (KR);
F28F3/04 (KR);
F28F3/044 (EP,SE,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | QUERSTRÖMUNGS-WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2009/47] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER OF CROSSFLOW TYPE | [2009/47] | French: | CHANGEUR DE CHALEUR DE TYPE À FLUX TRANSVERSAL | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 29.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/50] | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4915163 (MATSUNAGA KEN [JP], et al); | [X]US5669439 (HASEGAWA ETSUO [JP], et al); | [A]DE102004050758 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]); | [X]US2006249281 (PARK TAEYOUNG [KR], et al); | [A]US2007006998 (BROST VIKTOR [DE]) | International search | [A]EP0136481 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]); | [A]US4800954 (NOGUCHI ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0984239 (IP COMPACT AB [SE]) |